Henley v. Love Insurance Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Hudson Henley |
Defendant: |
Love Insurance Group LLC and American Bankers Insurance of Florida |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv03078 |
Filed: |
September 22, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 4001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 4, 2018 |
Filing
90
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: This Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order ("Amended Opinion") supersedes and vacates the Memorandum Opinion and Order issued by the court on 3/31/2018. The court denies in part and grants in part Plaint iff's Motion in Limine (Doc. 67 ) as herein set forth; and denies Defendant Love Insurance Group, LLC's Motion in Limine (Doc. 70 ) as herein set forth. The court finds and concludes that Henley is entitled to recover on its claim for bre ach of contract against Love in the amount of $837,367.65. The court, therefore, will enter judgment in favor of Henley in accordance with this Amended Opinion after the parties submit their briefs regarding interest. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/4/2018) (sss)
|
March 31, 2018 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Plaintiff's 67 Motion in Limine as herein set forh; and denies Defendant Love Insurance Group, LLC's 70 Motion in Limine as herein set forth. The court finds and concludes that Henley is e ntitled to recover on its claim of breach of contract against Love in the amount of $837,367.65. The court, therefore, will enter judgment in favor of Henley in accordance with this memorandum opinion and order the week of 4/2/2018, and hereby directs the clerk of court to close this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2018) (axm)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the breach of contract claim; and denies it with respect to the amount of damages to which Henley is entitled. Plaintiff has indicated th at he will likely elect the breach of contract remedy and nonsuit the rest of his claims. Plaintiff is instructed to inform the court by 3/6/2017. If Plaintiff nonsuits his remaining claims, then the parties are directed to file a written submission and inform the court of the amount of time to try the issue of damages by 3/10/2017. The parties are also to provide the court by 3/10/2017, three separate weeks in three separate months in which they are available to try this action with respect to damages. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/24/2017) (axm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?