Mauer v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Angela Mauer |
Defendant: |
Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East Inc and Wal-Mart Real Est Business |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02085 |
Filed: |
July 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
David L Horan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Wal-Mart's Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims [Dkt. No. 55 ] and dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff Angela Mauer's remaining claims for general negligence, negligent activity, and gross negligence. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/7/2018) (sss)
|
December 15, 2017 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff Angela Mauer's Amended Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition [Dkt. No. 45 ] and ORDERS Plaintiff Angela Mauer to file, by December 18, 2017, a Second Amend ed Complaint that includes all of the amended allegations in her proposed her proposed Second Amended Petition [Dkt. No. 45-1] other than those in Paragraphs 4.10-4.12 and 5.9-5.10 and with the understanding that the Court has dismissed her claim fo r premises liability with prejudice and is not reviving that claim by this order. To accommodate this additional pleading, the Court extends the deadline for Defendants' leave to file a dispositive motion on Plaintiff's general neglige nce, negligent activity, and gross negligence claims to December 29, 2017, with a response due by January 19, 2018 and any reply due by February 2, 2018. And Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., d/b/a Wal-Mart #1055, and Wal-Mart Real Est Business must file an answer to Mauer's Second Amended Complaint by January 2, 2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/15/2017) (mcrd)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Wal-Mart's Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims [Dkt. No. 30 ] and dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff Angela Mauer's premises liability claim. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/5/2017) (mcrd)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing
21
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 12 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 10/5/2016) (rekc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?