State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Freehold Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Freehold Management, Inc. and Retail Plazas, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv02255 |
Filed: |
August 3, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 12, 2023 |
Filing
428
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 321 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration as to Rocco Calaci; and granting in part and denying in part 324 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration as to Matthew Phelps. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/12/2023) (chmb)
|
August 22, 2019 |
Filing
266
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying [Docs. 186, 193] Plaintiff's and Defendants' summary judgment motions. Rather than conducting a pretrial conference and selecting a jury on September 13, 2019, the hearing on September 13, 2019, will be used to conduct a Daubert hearing to determine whether the parties' experts, who remain after the court's previous ruling on expert motions, are qualified and their opinions are relevant and reliable.The parties must be prepared to present their respective expert witnesses and establish the admissibility of the expert testimony expected to be offered during the trial under Rule 702 and Daubert. By August 30, 2019, the parties shall also file, for the court's consideration in advance of the Daubert hearing, copies of the Rule 26 expert reports that were prepared by the experts who are expected to testify at trial. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/22/2019) (chmb)
|
March 31, 2019 |
Filing
261
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendants' Motion to Strike the Expert Testimony of Hallmark Roofing 135 is granted; Defendants' Amended Motion to Strike the Expert Testimony of Timothy Marshall 183 is denied; Defendants' Amended M otion to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Nilles 190 is granted; Plaintiff State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company's Amended Motion to Strike and/or Exclude the Expert Testimony of Matt Phelps, Rocco Calaci, Roger Grimm, Gary B. Treider, and Carolyn Coleman 196 is granted with respect to Matt Phelps, Rocco Calaci, and Roger Grimm, and denied with respect to Gary B. Treider and Carolyn Coleman. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2019) (chmb)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company's 77 Motion for Leave to Designate Justin Kestner as an Expert Witness. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/26/2018) (zkc)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
118
Memorandum Opinion and Order GRANTS in part and DENIES in part and DEFERS RULING in part on 83 MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatories. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 7/24/2018) (epm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?