Abel et al v. Willis of Colorado Inc et al
Plaintiff: Abel, Stanford Kauffman, Bradley J Davis, Thomas E Van Autreve, Michael S Vaughan, Edward L Vaughn, Jose Antonio Vigorena, Reginald Villalovas, Maria Elena Villalovas, Joan W Villarubia, Deborah Vollmer, Hemant Vyas, Chuni Vyas, Maxine Wilson, Kenneth J Winningkoff, Ginger Winningkoff, Kate Lane Withers, Moonyean Wood, Douglas E Young, Vince Zagone, Brett Zagone, Adriana Zaragoza, Gordon W Zothner, Alice M Zothner, Russell Shane Gautreaux, Ruben J Cruz, Robert S Culvern, Jerome J Cwiok, Delia M Cwiok, Calvin Darden, Charles Stephen Dark, Joyce Dark, Charley Davidson, Stephen Davis, Mary Davis, Gerrit S Dawson, Joseph James Flynn, Linda R Seager, Julius J Sedtal Jr, Sherry A Sedtal, Bela Sen, Dennis R Schaffer, Norma Shaw, Robert Scott Shean, Valerie Shean, Suzanne T Shean, Gregory M Shelton, Robert D Shingler, Michael R Short, Julia Darden, Kahne Guillot, Ernesto A Brizuela, Marcus Bromley, Jon Michael Bryant, Nancy Bryant, Kenneth Bubes, Shara Bubes, Charles Buck, Rhonda L Buck, James R Calvin, Ralph V Caplan, Kimberly Stewart, Diana Smith, Lorena Karpen, Kim Vince, Malvern Lusky, Jeff Chimenti, Lawrence M Martin, Debra Sledge, Fred Mills, Sandra E Moore, James Shaw, Hinwig Lee, Paul Madan, William A Mancuso, Jean G Mancuso, Norris A Marchand, Marilyn A Martin, Manuel L Martinez, Natalie Martinez, Gregory Martinoia, Robert Matejek, Martha A McDonald, Delores McLaughlin, Alton B Laskowski, Cynthia Ann Laskowski, Martin Paul Lassoff, Kathryn Ellen Urbanek, Grace Chen LeBlanc, Ronald E Lee, Ann Lestarjette, Michelle Levet, Sherrill M Lineberger, Patricia Lorie, Rhonda D Dawson, Steven R Day, Kathleen Day, Emma Bray Deavours, Frances G (Cromers) Deavours, Jason Deavours, John DeChaud, Edward L Diefenthal, Nancy L Diefenthal, Gennaro DiMeo, Elsa DiMeo, Lee Caplan, Carol E Cappello, Allen R Caradine, Diane F Caradine, Donald Carey, John L Carey, Patricia A Carey, Thomas P Carroll, Alene M Casemore, Rosine Chappell, George Greisinger, Barbara Griffin, Richard Lee Groesbeck, Jacquelyn Groesbeck, Suzanne Haggard, James S Hake, Beth L Hake, John A Harrill Jr, James Stanley Harris, George Hart, Diane Hart, John Mantague, Betty Montague, Timothy R Moore, Rolando H Mora, Hannalore Mora, Maurice S Moragne, Frank H Morgan, Cynthia D Morgan, Thomas Newland, Danny R Myers, Mark Najarian, Justin Thompson, The Timothy R and Sandra E More Family LP, Quaint Properties LLC, Anne Queyrouze, Jerry Stephen Raeder, Silver Lake Risk Services,, John Michael Schuelke, Kim Guillot, Albert J DiVagno, William H Downing, Anna Marie Downing, James G Dubos, Richard D Eames, Nanciann Eames, Karen S Egedy, James Escort, Rick B Ferguson, Rose Fife, John Fife, Edward Fiori, Rose Ann Martin, Boundless Insurance Co LTD, The Camellia Family Limited Partnership, Barbara Pichnie Culotta, The D Smith Family Limited Partnership, The Karpen 1994 Family LP, Harold D Siegel, Paula C Siegel, Larry S Simeral, Virginia H Simeral, Mark T Simon, Guy Wayne Sledge, Debra Sledge, Richard Shannon Smith, Wanda Smith, Bruce Smitherman,, Stephanie Madan, Robert L Johnston, Paul A Jones, Portia L Jones, Mary Jordan, William E Junell, Carol Junell, Paul M Kelly, Ruth M Kelly, Michael Kepesky, William Kessler, Susan B Kessler, Mark W Kidd, Karen Lynn Robbins, James E Rohde, Rose Rohde, Rene J Saenz, Martha A Saenz, Joseph C Schneider Jr, Thomas H Schneider, Lynn L Schneider, Robert L Scholie, Janice Scholie, Thomas G Schultz, Kela Campbell, Patrick LeBlanc, Sandra LeBlanc, Louis Mechanical Contractors Inc, Lusky Investment Partnership LP, MSM Ventures LP, Barbara Tassin, Dorothy F Taylor, Robert Taylor, Patricia Taylor, William P Tedeschi, Gerald J Thomas, Terence R Thompson Jr, James J Trucksess, Maureen E Trucksess, Michael H Turner, Patricia Raeder, Fae Woo, Robert C Ahders, Rodrigo Rivera Alcayaga, David Arntsen, Carlie Arntsen, Charles E Baker, Robert Lewis Bambauer, Anne H Barrett, Lawrence D Bartell, Kyle J Bauer, Thomas Bauersfeld, Camilla Bauersfeld, Todd S Klumok, Lisa Klumok, George Koshy, Aleyamma Koshy, Joseph L Krause Jr, Shirley Ladd, Luis L LaFontisee III, Jesse Lamberth, Byron S Landry, Linda L Landry, Isaac Ward Lang III, Linda G Lanoux, Kenneth D Parks, Doug Shaw, Steven W Payette, Hanna K Peck Finley, Barry Philips, Rebecca Philips, Charlotte L Pippin, William Pippin III, Paulette Porcaro, Thomas Clark Pritchard, Harry Pure, Ernest D Mercer, Joan Mercer, Keith Ellis Merkley, Janet Merkley, Jennifer Miller, Fred H Mills Jr, Deborah Mills, Martha M Minish, Calvin D Mitchell, Billy E Moak, Juan Pablo Molano, Jane Torgerson, Yolanda Lorie, Thomas J Low, Jerry D Lund, Geoffrey M Lyman, Andrea Lee Lyman, John M Maddox, Robert Maher, Ammaji Malineni, Vasavi Malineni, Richard Malouf, Daniel L Quinter, Gurdarshan K Rai, Adriana Ramos, Marilyn H Rangel, Byron A Ratliff, Evelyn Ann Ratliff, Dennis C Redding, Frank E Rinaldo, Susan S Rinaldo, Kerry Rinehart, Mack H Walpole, James A Hollabaugh Wanserski, Ed John Wienlein, Elizabeth, N Whitaker, Richard White, Nancy White, Anne Whittle, William Hampton Morris, Judy Williams, John M Wilson Jr, Richard Wilson, Elise Thyrre, Linda Kornswiet, Richard Garza, Kenneth D Gaspard, Linda L Gaspard, Debra S Gibbs, James J Gillespie, Ellen P Gilmore, Gail Giorgio, Betty Gosda, Carolyn R Gould, Bart Greer, Shawnda Greer, Reno Hartfiel, Linda Hartfiel, Susan C Heim, Gerald T Hennings, Dorothy E Hennings, Juan Manuel Hernaiz, Patricia Herr, Robert G Higgins, Rose Mareyna Hinz, John Hobgood, Robert Holt, Georgia Ann Holt, David Lenorovitz, Kimberly Fleming, Michael C Fleming, Josette M Fleszar, Jamey R Folland, Stanley Fountain, Jorgina Franzheim, Richard Henry Friedman, Harriet L Friedman, William J Garrity III, Janet M Garrity, Judith Cotton, Saul Solomon, Adrienne Solomon, Iakovos Spetsiotakis, Michael L Spurlock, Franklin H Stansel, Mary Cote Stegen, Janet A Steinway, Thomas W Stoll, Mary C Stoll, Charles Sydney, Donna M Sydney, Lauren Drews-Davidson, Danette Sue Chimenti, Joann A Clabby, Garland M Cohlmia, Kieth C Cook, William T Cook, Mary Alice Cook, Corwin Randal Courtney, Tammy Jean Courtney, Linda G Cowart, Albert L Cox, Susan Trimble Crane, Steven Queyrouze, Justin Raeder, Ticker Tape Partners, Thornton Tye Investments LP, Thornton Tye Medical LP, Debbie W Hughey, William Huse, Gordon Jaehne, Plas T James, Brian Janz, Lisa M Janz, Jacqueline F Jenkins, Morris L Jenkins, Molly R Jenkins, Max Jensen, Anne Rush, Jacob P Johnson, Lanette P Johnson, Edna Abel, Mark Nekhom, Lisa Nekhom, David N Nelson, Pamela J Nelson, Barbara Offerman, William Ohrt, Jennicer Ohrt, Pedro Ruenes, John R Packer, Pamela C Packer, Don M Parkinson, Marilyn Parkinson, Randy C Bellelo, David J Belock Jr, Sheri Berger, Russell R Bergeron, Stanley J Bertman, Scott M Boeker, Daniel J Bonfiglio, Angela K Bonfiglio, John C Bonfiglio, Beverly Braud, Gary Martin and M Tag Ventures LP, MACO Investments LLC, Carroll S Mayer Jr, Henry J Mills Company Inc, Mills Cashway Pharmacy
Defendant: Willis of Colorado Inc, Willis Ltd and WGH Holdings Ltd
Case Number: 3:2016cv02601
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
2 Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS: The final hearing on the Motion is set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/23/2018. (ewd)
March 5, 2018 Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-11122 (related to #15 appeal): transmitted to Michael Jung on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
November 15, 2017 Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-11122 (related to #15 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
October 3, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-11122 in USCA5 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Edna Abel. (axm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Edna Abel. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8689305. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Stanley, Michael)
September 13, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - Hunton & Williams, LLP -- filed by Ralph S. Janvey et al. The final hearing is set for 11/28/17 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/7/2017. (ash)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Joint Expedited Motion filed by the Receiver, the Examiner and the Official Stanford Investors Committee seeking a status conference in 3:09-md-2099 at 70 is GRANTED. The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 11/28/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Final Approval Hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas, at 10:00 a.m. on 11/28/17, which is a date at least ninety (90) calendar days after entry of this Scheduling Order. Any Person who wishes to object to the terms of the Settlement, the Bar Order, the Judgment and Bar Order, or Plaintiffs' request for approval of attorney's fees, or who wishes to appear at the Final Approval Hearing, must file a written objection in 3:09-CV-0298-N through ECF or by mailing the written objection to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 by 11/7/17. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
July 14, 2017 The referred matters in this action are now assigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. (MDL 2099) (twd)
November 15, 2016 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Willis of Colorado Inc. (rekc)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable David C. Godbey, United States District Judge, where a related case is pending. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/14/2016) (sss)
November 10, 2016 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against WGH Holdings Ltd, Willis Ltd, Willis of Colorado Inc filed by all plaintiffs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Summons) (Stanley, Michael) Modified text on 11/14/2016 (rekc).
September 16, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to WGH Holdings Ltd, Willis Ltd, and Willis of Colorado Inc. (ran)
September 16, 2016 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Edna Abel. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Stanley, Michael)
September 16, 2016 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD - CORRECTED DOCUMENT TO BE FILED*** SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Edna Abel. (Stanley, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cea).
September 16, 2016 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD - CORRECTED DOCUMENT TO BE FILED*** SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Edna Abel. (Stanley, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cea).
September 16, 2016 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD - CORRECTED DOCUMENT TO BE FILED*** SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Edna Abel. (Stanley, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2016 (cea).
September 14, 2016 Filing 3 Court Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan has recused. The referred matters in this action are now assigned to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (ash)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mem)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against WGH Holdings, LTD., Willis Ltd, Willis of Colorado, Inc. filed by Edna Abel, et al.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7858629) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stanley, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abel et al v. Willis of Colorado Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Kauffman
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J Davis
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Van Autreve, Michael S Vaughan, Edward L Vaughn, Jose Antonio Vigorena, Reginald Villalovas, Maria Elena Villalovas, Joan W Villarubia, Deborah Vollmer, Hemant Vyas, Chuni Vyas
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Wilson, Kenneth J Winningkoff, Ginger Winningkoff, Kate Lane Withers, Moonyean Wood, Douglas E Young, Vince Zagone, Brett Zagone, Adriana Zaragoza, Gordon W Zothner, Alice M Zothner
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Shane Gautreaux
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben J Cruz, Robert S Culvern, Jerome J Cwiok, Delia M Cwiok, Calvin Darden, Charles Stephen Dark, Joyce Dark, Charley Davidson, Stephen Davis, Mary Davis, Gerrit S Dawson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph James Flynn
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda R Seager, Julius J Sedtal Jr, Sherry A Sedtal, Bela Sen, Dennis R Schaffer, Norma Shaw, Robert Scott Shean, Valerie Shean, Suzanne T Shean, Gregory M Shelton, Robert D Shingler, Michael R Short
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Darden
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kahne Guillot
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto A Brizuela, Marcus Bromley, Jon Michael Bryant, Nancy Bryant, Kenneth Bubes, Shara Bubes, Charles Buck, Rhonda L Buck, James R Calvin, Ralph V Caplan
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Stewart, Diana Smith, Lorena Karpen, Kim Vince, Malvern Lusky, Jeff Chimenti, Lawrence M Martin, Debra Sledge, Fred Mills, Sandra E Moore, James Shaw, Hinwig Lee
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Madan
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Mancuso, Jean G Mancuso, Norris A Marchand, Marilyn A Martin, Manuel L Martinez, Natalie Martinez, Gregory Martinoia, Robert Matejek, Martha A McDonald, Delores McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton B Laskowski, Cynthia Ann Laskowski, Martin Paul Lassoff, Kathryn Ellen Urbanek, Grace Chen LeBlanc, Ronald E Lee, Ann Lestarjette, Michelle Levet, Sherrill M Lineberger, Patricia Lorie
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda D Dawson, Steven R Day, Kathleen Day, Emma Bray Deavours, Frances G (Cromers) Deavours, Jason Deavours, John DeChaud, Edward L Diefenthal, Nancy L Diefenthal, Gennaro DiMeo, Elsa DiMeo
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Caplan, Carol E Cappello, Allen R Caradine, Diane F Caradine, Donald Carey, John L Carey, Patricia A Carey, Thomas P Carroll, Alene M Casemore, Rosine Chappell
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Greisinger, Barbara Griffin, Richard Lee Groesbeck, Jacquelyn Groesbeck, Suzanne Haggard, James S Hake, Beth L Hake, John A Harrill Jr, James Stanley Harris, George Hart, Diane Hart
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mantague, Betty Montague, Timothy R Moore, Rolando H Mora, Hannalore Mora, Maurice S Moragne, Frank H Morgan, Cynthia D Morgan, Thomas Newland, Danny R Myers, Mark Najarian
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Thompson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Timothy R and Sandra E More Family LP, Quaint Properties LLC, Anne Queyrouze, Jerry Stephen Raeder, Silver Lake Risk Services,
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Schuelke
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Guillot
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert J DiVagno, William H Downing, Anna Marie Downing, James G Dubos, Richard D Eames, Nanciann Eames, Karen S Egedy, James Escort, Rick B Ferguson, Rose Fife, John Fife, Edward Fiori
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Martin
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boundless Insurance Co LTD, The Camellia Family Limited Partnership, Barbara Pichnie Culotta, The D Smith Family Limited Partnership, The Karpen 1994 Family LP
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold D Siegel, Paula C Siegel, Larry S Simeral, Virginia H Simeral, Mark T Simon, Guy Wayne Sledge, Debra Sledge, Richard Shannon Smith, Wanda Smith, Bruce Smitherman,
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Madan
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Johnston, Paul A Jones, Portia L Jones, Mary Jordan, William E Junell, Carol Junell, Paul M Kelly, Ruth M Kelly, Michael Kepesky, William Kessler, Susan B Kessler, Mark W Kidd
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lynn Robbins, James E Rohde, Rose Rohde, Rene J Saenz, Martha A Saenz, Joseph C Schneider Jr, Thomas H Schneider, Lynn L Schneider, Robert L Scholie, Janice Scholie, Thomas G Schultz
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kela Campbell
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick LeBlanc, Sandra LeBlanc, Louis Mechanical Contractors Inc, Lusky Investment Partnership LP, MSM Ventures LP
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tassin, Dorothy F Taylor, Robert Taylor, Patricia Taylor, William P Tedeschi, Gerald J Thomas, Terence R Thompson Jr, James J Trucksess, Maureen E Trucksess, Michael H Turner
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Raeder
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fae Woo
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Ahders, Rodrigo Rivera Alcayaga, David Arntsen, Carlie Arntsen, Charles E Baker, Robert Lewis Bambauer, Anne H Barrett, Lawrence D Bartell, Kyle J Bauer, Thomas Bauersfeld, Camilla Bauersfeld
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd S Klumok, Lisa Klumok, George Koshy, Aleyamma Koshy, Joseph L Krause Jr, Shirley Ladd, Luis L LaFontisee III, Jesse Lamberth, Byron S Landry, Linda L Landry, Isaac Ward Lang III, Linda G Lanoux
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Parks, Doug Shaw, Steven W Payette, Hanna K Peck Finley, Barry Philips, Rebecca Philips, Charlotte L Pippin, William Pippin III, Paulette Porcaro, Thomas Clark Pritchard, Harry Pure
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest D Mercer, Joan Mercer, Keith Ellis Merkley, Janet Merkley, Jennifer Miller, Fred H Mills Jr, Deborah Mills, Martha M Minish, Calvin D Mitchell, Billy E Moak, Juan Pablo Molano
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Torgerson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Lorie, Thomas J Low, Jerry D Lund, Geoffrey M Lyman, Andrea Lee Lyman, John M Maddox, Robert Maher, Ammaji Malineni, Vasavi Malineni
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Malouf
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L Quinter, Gurdarshan K Rai, Adriana Ramos, Marilyn H Rangel, Byron A Ratliff, Evelyn Ann Ratliff, Dennis C Redding, Frank E Rinaldo, Susan S Rinaldo, Kerry Rinehart
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack H Walpole, James A Hollabaugh Wanserski, Ed John Wienlein, Elizabeth, N Whitaker, Richard White, Nancy White, Anne Whittle, William Hampton Morris, Judy Williams, John M Wilson Jr, Richard Wilson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Thyrre
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kornswiet
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Garza, Kenneth D Gaspard, Linda L Gaspard, Debra S Gibbs, James J Gillespie, Ellen P Gilmore, Gail Giorgio, Betty Gosda, Carolyn R Gould, Bart Greer, Shawnda Greer
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno Hartfiel, Linda Hartfiel, Susan C Heim, Gerald T Hennings, Dorothy E Hennings, Juan Manuel Hernaiz, Patricia Herr, Robert G Higgins, Rose Mareyna Hinz, John Hobgood, Robert Holt, Georgia Ann Holt
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lenorovitz
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fleming, Michael C Fleming, Josette M Fleszar, Jamey R Folland, Stanley Fountain, Jorgina Franzheim, Richard Henry Friedman, Harriet L Friedman, William J Garrity III, Janet M Garrity
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Cotton
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Solomon, Adrienne Solomon, Iakovos Spetsiotakis, Michael L Spurlock, Franklin H Stansel, Mary Cote Stegen, Janet A Steinway, Thomas W Stoll, Mary C Stoll, Charles Sydney, Donna M Sydney
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Drews-Davidson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danette Sue Chimenti, Joann A Clabby, Garland M Cohlmia, Kieth C Cook, William T Cook, Mary Alice Cook, Corwin Randal Courtney, Tammy Jean Courtney, Linda G Cowart, Albert L Cox, Susan Trimble Crane
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Queyrouze
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Raeder
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ticker Tape Partners, Thornton Tye Investments LP, Thornton Tye Medical LP
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie W Hughey, William Huse, Gordon Jaehne, Plas T James, Brian Janz, Lisa M Janz, Jacqueline F Jenkins, Morris L Jenkins, Molly R Jenkins, Max Jensen, Anne Rush, Jacob P Johnson, Lanette P Johnson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Abel
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nekhom, Lisa Nekhom, David N Nelson, Pamela J Nelson, Barbara Offerman, William Ohrt, Jennicer Ohrt, Pedro Ruenes, John R Packer, Pamela C Packer, Don M Parkinson, Marilyn Parkinson
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy C Bellelo, David J Belock Jr, Sheri Berger, Russell R Bergeron, Stanley J Bertman, Scott M Boeker, Daniel J Bonfiglio, Angela K Bonfiglio, John C Bonfiglio, Beverly Braud
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Martin
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Tag Ventures LP, MACO Investments LLC, Carroll S Mayer Jr, Henry J Mills Company Inc, Mills Cashway Pharmacy
Represented By: Michael J Stanley
Represented By: William Shawn Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis of Colorado Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WGH Holdings Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?