Heritage Capital Corporation et al v. Christies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc, Currency Auctions of America Inc and Heritage Collectibles Inc
Defendant: Christies, Inc, Christies Inc and Collectrium Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv03404
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Sealed Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Confirm Stipulated Injunction filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/6/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Please submit your proposed order for the following motion -- in modifiable Word or WordPerfect format -- to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov.: #65 Sealed Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Confirm Stipulated Injunction filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (Document Restricted) Sealed Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Confirm Stipulated Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc. (ndt)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/27/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (Document Restricted) SEALED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL, MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-A, #3 Proposed Order) (Bayer, Mark)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT: It is ordered and adjudged that the Final Award dated 6/3/2019 in the arbitration between Heritage Capital Corp et al, claimants, and Christie's Inc et al, respondents, in Case Number 1310023168, is confirmed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/15/2019) (mla)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Confirm Final Arbitration Award. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/15/2019) (mla)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The clerk of court is directed to unseal the following documents in this case: ECF Doc. Nos. 49, 49-1, 49-2, and 49-3. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2019) (zkc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re: #58 MOTION Confirm Final Arbitration Award (Gray, Tonya)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION Confirm Final Arbitration Award filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Currency Auctions of America Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Auctions Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Capital Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Collectibles Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc(pty:pla) (Baggett, Tamara)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Plaintiffs to Lift the Temporary Seal re: #53 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Baggett, Tamara)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT: For the reasons set out in an order filed today, it is ordered and adjudged that the Partial Final Award dated 2/14/2019 in the arbitration between Heritage Capital Corp., et al., claimants, and Christie's Inc., et al., respondents, in Case Number 1310023168, is confirmed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2019) (ykp)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2019) (ykp)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection re: #49 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/3/2019) filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc (Gray, Tonya)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Joint Motion to Seal Additional Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. The Clerk's Office is directed to seal the following documents, until this Court receives notice from either party that the arbitration case has concluded and the stipulation no longer applies, or as otherwise further stipulated by the parties and/or ordered by this Court: (1) Defendants' Partial Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, which will be filed tomorrow; and (2) Any additional filings permitted by the Court concerning Plaintiffs Motion to Confirm. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/2/2019) (axm)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint Motion to Temporarily Seal Additional Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gray, Tonya)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Joint Motion to Seal Documents. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/19/2019) (mla)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint Motion to Temporarily Seal Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, Memorandum of Law and Exhibits filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gray, Tonya)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Document Restricted) MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)Attorney Tamara D Baggett added to party Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc(pty:pla) (Baggett, Tamara) Modified security level on 3/19/2019 per #50 Motion (axm).
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #44 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/12/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re: #44 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Setnick, Benjamin)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc re: #44 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support) (Tiemstra, Laura)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Appendix in Support filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re #44 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Setnick, Benjamin)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Setnick, Benjamin)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Report to Copyright Office of Final Order. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (twd)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JUDGMENT in favor of Christie's Inc, Collectrium Inc against Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/1/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Christie's Inc, Collectrium Inc., denying as moot #23 Motion for Injunction filed by Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc.; denying as moot #34 Motion for Leave to File filed by Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc; and denying as moot #39 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Christie's Inc, Collectrium Inc. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/1/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Appendix in Support filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re #39 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Request for Expedited Briefing (Setnick, Benjamin)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Setnick, Benjamin)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/21/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2017. Discovery due by 3/2/2018. Status Report due by 3/2/2018. Motions due by 3/16/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/6/2017) (axm)
March 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Appendix in Support filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re #36 Response/Objection (Setnick, Benjamin)
March 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re: #34 MOTION for Leave to File DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Setnick, Benjamin)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc re: #23 MOTION for Injunction PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Bayer, Mark)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bayer, Mark)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters (Rule 26f Report) by Heritage Auctions Inc. (Vartian, Armen)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Appendix in Support filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re #31 Response/Objection (Setnick, Benjamin)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re: #23 MOTION for Injunction PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Setnick, Benjamin)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Setnick, Benjamin)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Collectrium Inc ; served on 12/13/2016. (ykp)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Setnick, Benjamin)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Bayer, Mark)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of INTENT CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: #23 MOTION for Injunction PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc (Bayer, Mark)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/26/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc re #23 MOTION for Injunction PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Declaration of Steve Ivy, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Shipman, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - Declaration of Laura Tiemstra) (Bayer, Mark)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Injunction PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bayer, Mark)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2017) (sss)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik C. Kane. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/19/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Erik C. Kane (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8142021) filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc (Setnick, Benjamin)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc. (Setnick, Benjamin)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc re #17 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Setnick, Benjamin)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Setnick, Benjamin)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc. Responsive pleading due 2/2/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/3/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Currency Auctions of America Inc, Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions Inc, Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles Inc, Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc, Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc re: #12 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Bayer, Mark)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Response due by 1/3/2017 to #12 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint extended through 1/10/2017 pending a ruling on MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/28/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Supplemental Document by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc as to #12 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Appendix with Attached Declaration and Ex. A-1). (Setnick, Benjamin)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Setnick, Benjamin)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Christies Inc, with Affidavit of Service; served on 12/13/2016. (mem)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura C. Tiemstra. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/19/2016) (chmb)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Armen R. Vartian. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/19/2016) (chmb)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Court Recusal: Judge David C Godbey recused, and the Clerk randomly reassigned this action to Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater. Future references to this case shall be indicated as 3:16-CV-3404-D. (ash)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (rekc)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Christies Inc, Collectrium Inc. (rekc)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Laura C. Tiemstra (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8060603) filed by Currency Auctions of America, Inc., Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions, Inc., Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles, Inc., Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers, Inc., Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bayer, Mark)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Armen R. Vartian (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8060592) filed by Currency Auctions of America, Inc., Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions, Inc., Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles, Inc., Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers, Inc., Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bayer, Mark)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Currency Auctions of America, Inc., Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions, Inc., Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles, Inc., Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers, Inc., Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Heritage Capital Corporation for Heritage Auctions, Inc., Heritage Collectibles, Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Heritage Numismatic Auctions, Inc. for Currency Auctions of America, Inc.. (Bayer, Mark)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Christies, Inc., Collectrium, Inc. filed by Currency Auctions of America, Inc., Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc, Heritage Auctions, Inc., Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions, Inc., Heritage Capital Corporation, Heritage Collectibles, Inc., Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8060480) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-E, #2 Cover Sheet) (Bayer, Mark) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened image on 12/9/2016) (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Capital Corporation et al v. Christies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christies Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Setnick
Represented By: Erik C. Kane
Represented By: Tonya M Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collectrium Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Setnick
Represented By: Erik C. Kane
Represented By: Tonya M Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Capital Corporation
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Auctioneers & Galleries Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Numismatic Auctioneers Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Auctions Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Vintage Sports Auctions Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Currency Auctions of America Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Collectibles Inc
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Armen R Vartian
Represented By: Laura Tiemstra
Represented By: Tamara D Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?