United Healthcare Services Inc et al v. Next Health LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services Inc and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Defendant: Next Health LLC, United Toxicology LLC, Medicus Laboratories LLC, US Toxicology LLC, American Laboratories Group LLC, Erik Bugen and Kirk Zajac
Case Number: 3:2017cv00243
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motions to dismiss filed by Executive Defendants (Docs. 398 , 401 , 404 , 407 , 411 , 416 , 419 , 422 , and 427 ) and Entity Defendants (Doc. 418 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Accordingly, if United can, in good faith, replead the dismissed claims to state claims upon which relief can be granted, it may do so on or before 3/19/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/26/2021) (ctf)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 194 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim or for More Definite Statement. The Entity Defendants must file amended pleadings by 4/30/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/29/2019) (axm)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations re: 235 Findings and Recommendations. The Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is granted and the Clerk of Court is directed to set aside the entry of default against Defendant Kirk Zajac's. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/7/2019) (epm)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER ACCEPTING 234 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 205 MOTION to Remove the Defendant Erik Bugen from the Cause and Case. The motion is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/5/2019) (aaa)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants in part and denies in part the Entity Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss. The Court denies United's 93 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Portions of the Counterclaims and grants United's 93 Motion for a More Definite Statement. The Entity Defendants must file amended pleadings by 7/31/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/20/2018) (zkc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Healthcare Services Inc et al v. Next Health LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services Inc
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Stephen W Mooney
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Stephen W Mooney
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Health LLC
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Represented By: Micah Ethan Skidmore
Represented By: Nicole Durham Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Toxicology LLC
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Represented By: Micah Ethan Skidmore
Represented By: Nicole Durham Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Represented By: Micah Ethan Skidmore
Represented By: Nicole Durham Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Toxicology LLC
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Represented By: Micah Ethan Skidmore
Represented By: Nicole Durham Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Laboratories Group LLC
Represented By: Ernest Martin, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Represented By: Micah Ethan Skidmore
Represented By: Nicole Durham Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Bugen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Zajac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?