Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc v United States of America
Plaintiff: Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00372
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff take nothing by this suit against Defendant and that this suit be, and hereby is, DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/13/2017) (rekc)
September 28, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on September 19, 2017 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawnie Archuleta, Telephone number 214/753-2747. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (35 pages) Redaction Request due 10/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2017. (spa)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER: The Court GRANTS the United States' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint To Quash Summons. Doc. #10 . (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/22/2017) (sss)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 the United States' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Quash Summons. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/19/2017) (ams)
September 19, 2017 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane J. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2017 re #10 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Quash Summons. Motion granted. Order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael Anthony Villa, Jr and Matthew Lance Roberts; Defense - Amber Woodward. (Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:36. (chmb)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets the Defendant, United States' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Quash Summons (doc. 10) for a hearing on Tuesday, September 19, 2017 at 2:30 pm. The lawyers for each side are directed to confirm their attendance at the hearing (by e-mail to Boyle_Clerk) no later than three days prior to the scheduled hearing. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/11/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle)
May 17, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY filed by United States of America re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Woodward-DOJ, Amber)
May 3, 2017 Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc re #14 Response/Objection Of United States' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to Quash Summons (Villa, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Villa, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc. (Villa, Michael)
April 21, 2017 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Woodward-DOJ, Amber)
April 12, 2017 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Woodward-DOJ, Amber)
April 12, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Amber Woodward-DOJ added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Woodward-DOJ, Amber)
March 14, 2017 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Villa, Michael)
February 28, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Villa, Michael)
February 17, 2017 Filing 7 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc. (Villa, Michael)
February 14, 2017 Filing 6 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sss)
February 14, 2017 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons In A Civil Action filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc. (Villa, Michael)
February 9, 2017 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Medicine Store Pharmacy, Inc. (Villa, Michael)
February 8, 2017 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
February 8, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medicine Store Pharmacy, Inc.. (Villa, Michael)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Medicine Store Pharmacy, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8193761) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Villa, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicine Store Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Michael Anthony Villa, Jr
Represented By: Charles M Meadows, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Lance Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Amber Woodward-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?