Adams v. US Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Barbara A Adams
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Cheldan Homes LP and Guild Mortgage Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv00723
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jane J. Boyle
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ACCEPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Because the Court is granting leave to replead, the Judgment entered on 10/4/2017 [Dkt. No. 40 is VACATED as premature. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/11/2017) (aaa)
October 4, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/4/2017) (aaa)
July 19, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Accepting 29 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 8 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Barbara A Adams. The Court DENIES Plaintiff Barbara A. Adams's 8 Motion to Remand Removed Action, and her claims against Defendant Cheldan Homes, L.P. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/19/2017) (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Adams
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Represented By: Jason Andrew LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheldan Homes LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guild Mortgage Company
Represented By: Rodney Acker
Represented By: Barrett Thomas Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?