Johnson et al v. Raytheon Company
Plaintiff: Dana Johnson and United States of America
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv01098
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 21-11060 (related to #148 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 2 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 96, 103, 109, 113, 131, 135, 140 (circuit approval is required for access), 1 Electronic Presentence Report/SOR certified to USCA. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (ajb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Transcript Order Form: re #148 Notice of Appeal,,,, transcript requested by Dana Johnson for Motion for Summary Judgment hearing held 8/30/2021 (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson.) Payment method: Private funds - Requester has obtained the estimate from the reporter and has paid or will pay the cost as directed. Reminder: If the transcript is ordered for an appeal, Appellant must also file a copy of the order form with the appeals court. (Sanford, Brian)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #142 Judgment, #122 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,, #140 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order to the Fifth Circuit by Dana Johnson. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-12313581. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Sanford, Brian)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Costs Taxed in amount of $ $995.00 against Dana Johnson (ykp)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 BILL OF COSTS by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit(s) to Declaration in Support of Bill of Costs) (Blanchard, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Unsealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Joint MOTION to Unseal #140 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER filed by Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) Modified on 9/24/2021 (Fitzwater, Sidney).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Unseal Document #141 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,, filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blanchard, Charles)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT in favor of Raytheon Company, United States of America against Dana Johnson. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/21/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re Unsealing Sealed memorandum opinion and order. The court has today filed #140 a sealed memorandum opinion and order in this case. The memorandum opinion and order is filed under seal because it may disclose materials submitted under seal during the briefing process. Within 14 days of the date the memorandum opinion and order is filed, the parties must file a joint request identifying the parts that they request remain sealed. Response due by 10/5/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/21/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 (Document Restricted) Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/21/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Oral Argument Proceedings held on 8/30/2021 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (45 pages) Redaction Request due 9/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2021. (pjw) (Main Document 139 replaced on 11/18/2021) (svc).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Motion Hearing/Oral Argument held on 8/30/2021 re #112 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Company. Taken under advisement. Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Brian Sanford with Elizabeth Sanford; Defense - Matthew D. Orwig with Charles A Blanchard. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:04. (chmb)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1351, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater re: #112 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/12/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Counsel are requested to confer and advise the court by letter of their availability to present oral argument on #112 defendant's motion to dismiss and/or for summary judgment on any of the following dates: August 2-5, 9-12, 16-19, 23-26, or 30, 2021. Counsel may submit the letter to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov. The court will later enter an order regarding the procedure and time limits for argument, but counsel may assume that the argument will be heard in the courtroom rather than by video. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #134 Reply (Sealed pursuant to order dated 2/19/2020) filed by Raytheon Company (Orwig, Matthew)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPLY filed by Raytheon Company re: #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supplement and Exhibit 31) (Orwig, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER vacating trial setting. On July 30, 2020 the court set this case for trial on July 6, 2021. Because there are pretrial proceedings to be completed before the case can be called to trial, the court vacates the trial setting. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/21/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OBJECTION filed by Dana Johnson re: #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 (Sanford, Brian)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #112 Motion for Summary Judgment, #130 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 2/19/2020) filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dana Johnson re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 Brief in Support of Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Sanford, Brian)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 (Sanford, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 6/15/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/14/2021) (oyh)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 6/14/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/26/2021) (mla)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Counsel. David Norris is permitted to withdraw from the case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/11/2021) (twd)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David Norris filed by Dana Johnson (Norris, David)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying without prejudice the relief requested by plaintiff Dana Johnson in #118 RULE 56(d) DECLARATION by Dana Johnson and setting briefing deadlines. Summary judgment response due 5/28/21; reply due 6/11/21; and any reply in support of Rule 56(d) relief due 6/25/21. Response due by 5/28/2021. Reply due by 6/11/2021. Reply re Rule 56(d) relief due by 6/25/2021. Re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment; #118 Rule 56(d) declaration. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/7/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPLY filed by Dana Johnson re: #120 Response/Objection (Sanford, Brian)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE filed by Raytheon Company re: #118 RULE 56(d) DECLARATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support) (Orwig, Matthew) Modified text on 4/12/2021 (mjr).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Appendix in Support filed by Dana Johnson re #118 RULE 56(d) DECLARATION (Sanford, Brian) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (jmg).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RULE 56(d) DECLARATION by Dana Johnson. (Sanford, Brian) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (jmg).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Plaintiff to file his response to the Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to 3/19/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/9/2021) (hml)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #111 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Stay of Certain Case Deadlines. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/24/2021) (ndt)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION Agreed Motion for Clarification and/or to Stay Certain Case Deadlines re #107 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Raytheon Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #111 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed pursuant to order dated 2/19/2020) filed by Raytheon Company (Orwig, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re ECF #111 filed by Raytheon Company (Orwig, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Raytheon's Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Orwig, Matthew) Modified text and terminated motion on 2/17/2021 (ali).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 11/17/2020 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If the transcript contains personal identifiers that must be redacted under MO 61, Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1, or if the transcript contains the name of a minor child victim or a minor child witness that must be redacted under 18 U.S.C. 3509, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (11 pages) Redaction Request due 2/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2021. (pjw)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #108 Supplemental Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 2/19/2020) filed by Raytheon Company (Orwig, Matthew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Supplemental Document by Raytheon Company as to #107 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Raytheon's Summary of the Basis for its Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix and Exhibits 1-14 (Public)) (Orwig, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AGREED ORDER GOVERNING RAYTHEONS FORTHCOMING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RELATED DISCOVERY: Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Motions due by 2/16/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/18/2020) (jmg)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Supplemental Document by Raytheon Company Proposed Agreed Order Governing Raytheon's Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Discovery. (Orwig, Matthew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2020. Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Brian Sanford, David Norris; Defense - Matt Orwig. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (chmb)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Please review the attached discussion outline before today's telephone conference. The court intends to discuss this proposed approach with counsel. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Sealed Document. ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: To obtain the call-in information needed to participate in the November 17, 2020 telephonic conference, please open the attached document. Questions about this information may be addressed to Pat Esquivel, the Court Coordinator, at 214-753-2336, or via her email address. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/12/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court sets the telephonic conference addressed in its 100 October 28, 2020 Advisory to Counsel for Tuesday, November 17, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. In advance of the conference, the court will notify counsel of the call-in information they will need to participate in the conference. A court reporter will report the conference. Non-lawyers may participate as they did in the conference the court conducted on September 21, 2020. Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 2:00 PM before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/1/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Unopposed STATUS REPORT filed by Dana Johnson. (Sanford, Brian)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: The court desires to convene a telephonic conference to confer with counsel about #99 their October 19, 2020 joint status report. Counsel are therefore requested to confer and advise the court of their availability on the following dates: November 16, 2020 (afternoon), 17 (afternoon), 18, 19, and 23. If none of these dates is available for all counsel, the court will suggest additional dates. The court will arrange for a court reporter to be present for the telephonic conference. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2020. The court has ordered the parties to file a Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Brian Sanford, David Norris, Elizabeth "BB' Sanford. Defense - Chuck Blanchard, Matt Orwig, Robine Grant, Jeff Hunt, Sharon Jones, and Beth Weinstein. Representing U. S. Government - Clay Mahaffey, Todd Casey, Tom Craddock, Tim Cothrel, and Viviano Gomez. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:30. (chmb)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Joint Report Regarding Anticipated Conference Attendees & Topics re: 95 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Raytheon Company (Orwig, Matthew)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 (Document Restricted) Sealed Document. ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: To obtain the call-in information needed to participate in the September 21, 2020 telephonic conference, please open the attached document. Questions about this information may be addressed to Pat Esquivel, the Court Coordinator, at 214-753-2336, or via her email address. (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court sets the telephonic conference addressed in its 93 August 20, 2020 Advisory to Counsel for Monday, September 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In advance of the conference, the court will notify counsel of the call-in information they will need to participate in the conference. Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/1/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Availability filed by Raytheon Company. (Grant, Robine) Modified event on 8/28/2020 (mla).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: In recent filings, counsel requested either a conference or hearing with the court. Although defendant's #86 motion for continuance and to modify amended scheduling order has been resolved, it may be helpful for the court to confer with counsel telephonically to hear the parties' descriptions of the issues, disputes, and other matters about which they wish to confer. The court intends for this to be an opportunity for counsel to describe their positions and identify issues, disputes, and other matters of which they believe the court should be aware, not a forum for presenting argument and obtaining substantive or procedural rulings. Counsel are therefore requested to confer and advise the court of their availability on any Monday, Tuesday, Wednesday, or Thursday in the month of September 2020. The court will arrange for a court reporter to be present for the telephonic conference. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #86 Motion to Continue. Motions due by 2/10/2021. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/30/2020) (mla)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Appendix in Support filed by Dana Johnson re #90 Response/Objection (Sanford, Brian)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #86 MOTION to Continue Motion for Continuance and to Modify Amended Scheduling Order (Sanford, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Supplemental Document by Raytheon Company as to #87 Notice (Other) Grant Letter to the Court re Correspondence from Department of the Navy. (Attachments: #1 Department of the Navy Letter to Johnson case counsel) (Grant, Robine)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of INTENT TO RESPOND re: #86 MOTION to Continue Motion for Continuance and to Modify Amended Scheduling Order filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Letter to the Court re Motion for Continuance and Navy Information Requests re: #86 MOTION to Continue Motion for Continuance and to Modify Amended Scheduling Order filed by Raytheon Company (Grant, Robine)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION to Continue Motion for Continuance and to Modify Amended Scheduling Order filed by Raytheon Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Robine Grant and Exhibits A-J.2, #2 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Raytheon Technologies Corporation for Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Written Consent to Trial Continuance to #81 Motion to Continue by Defendant Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew) Modified text on 3/30/2020 (ykp).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Compel. Defendant Raytheon Company is ORDERED to serve on Plaintiff, no later than 4/28/2020, its signed, supplemental answers to Plaintiffs RFA Nos. 1-18, that either admit or deny the matters inquired of, or that state in detail why it is unable to truthfully admit or deny all or part of such matters. Defendant Raytheon Company is FURTHER ORDERED to produce to Plaintiff, no later than 4/28/2020, all materials responsive to RFP Nos. 1-55 that are in Defendant Raytheon Company's custody, possession, or control. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/27/2020) (epm)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND ENTERING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The #81 unopposed motion for continuance and to modify amended scheduling order is conditionally granted in part and granted in part. Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Motions for summary judgment due by 8/10/2020. Joint estimate of trial length and joint status report due by 8/31/2020. This case is reset for trial on Monday, 11/16/2020 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/26/2020) (twd)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Continue and to Modify Amended Scheduling Order filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy Jeffress. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/20/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10717233) filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Amy Jeffress added to party Raytheon Company(pty:dft) (Jeffress, Amy)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Blanchard. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/10/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: In light of the Parties' Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Order, Doc. #71 , and the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Doc. #62 , denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Doc. #49 , it is unclear what issues, if any, raised by Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, Doc. #53 , and Defendant's Objection, Doc. #56 , remain in dispute. The parties are therefore ORDERED to file by March 16, 2020 a status report advising which discovery disputes, if any, remain. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/9/2020) (chmb)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10686813) filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Charles A Blanchard added to party Raytheon Company(pty:dft) (Blanchard, Charles)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Designate Expert Witnesses filed by Raytheon Company. The parties are granted an extension of time until and including March 27, 2020 to designate expert witnesses and otherwise comply with Rule 26(a)(2) relating to issues for which that party bears the burden of proof on a claim or defense. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/2/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Designate Expert Witnesses filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The court has set this case for trial by separate order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 4/10/2020. Status Report due by 4/30/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/19/2020) (ykp)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER (as modified by the court). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/19/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: If the parties desire that their #69 Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Order be entered as a court order, they are directed to submit their proposed order -- in modifiable Word or WordPerfect format -- to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov. A proposed court order is subject to court review and modification before entry. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Confidentiality Order by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint STATUS REPORT & Scheduling Proposal filed by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Jane Sanford on behalf of Dana Johnson. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sanford, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: No later than 21 days after this order is filed, the parties must submit their Joint Status Report. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/28/2020) (rekc)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint, filed by Raytheon Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Orwig, Matthew) Modified on 1/13/2020 (hml).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Raytheon Company answer due 1/10/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/3/2020) (ndt)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Raytheon Company; denying #57 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/19/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY filed by Raytheon Company re: #57 MOTION for Protective Order (Orwig, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #57 MOTION for Protective Order (Sanford, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY filed by Dana Johnson re: #53 MOTION to Compel and Brief (Sanford, Brian)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #57 MOTION for Protective Order (Orwig, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OBJECTION filed by Raytheon Company re: #53 MOTION to Compel and Brief (Orwig, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), plaintiff's October 21, 2019 #53 motion to compel is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for determination. She may conduct a hearing if she determines that a hearing is necessary. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/22/2019) (aaa)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Appendix in Support filed by Dana Johnson re #53 MOTION to Compel and Brief (Sanford, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Compel and Brief filed by Dana Johnson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Sanford, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY filed by Raytheon Company re: #49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Orwig, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's Complaint (Sanford, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Orwig, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Extend Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Raytheon Company is granted an extension of time until and including 9/13/2019 to answer or to otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/15/2019) (mla)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant Raytheon Company's Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRIAL SETTING ORDER: This case is set for a two-week trial beginning 6/2/2020 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/12/2019) (aaa)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Raytheon Company filed by Dana Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanford, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part as moot #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's First Amended Complaint filed by Raytheon Company; granting #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America; denying as moot #39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Company; and granting plaintiff 28 days to file a second amended complaint that alleges a retaliation claim against Raytheon Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #39 MOTION for Protective Order (Sanford, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Statement of Interest re: #40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by United States of America (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Referring Motion for Determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) re: #39 Motion for Protective Order. The Magistrate Judge may conduct a hearing if he/she determines that a hearing is necessary. This order of reference also prospectively refers all procedural motions (e.g., to modify briefing limitations, to supplement a motion, or for an expedited hearing) hereafter filed by a party who supports or opposes the referred motion, and that relate to the resolution of the motion. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/26/2019) (axm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #39 MOTION for Protective Order (Orwig, Matthew)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS RELATOR JOHNSON'S COMPLAINT filed by United States of America re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , #36 Response/Objection (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton) Modified title on 2/26/2019 (epm).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ***DISREGARD***Filed in ErrorTRIAL SETTING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/14/2019) (svc) Modified on 2/14/2019 (svc).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss (Sanford, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to #33 Motion to Partially Dismiss Responses due by 2/11/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/4/2019) (zkc)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Johnson (Sanford, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Interest or Other Pleading filed by United States of America. Statement of Interest due by 1/14/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/2/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Interest or Other Pleading filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's 11/16/2018 motion to dismiss plaintiff-relator's first amended complaint remains pending. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/31/2018) (zkc)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY filed by Raytheon Company re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's First Amended Complaint (Orwig, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's First Amended Complaint (Sanford, Brian)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Status Report due by 1/17/2020. Motions due by 1/17/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/29/2018) (zkc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint Scheduling Proposal and Rule 26(f) Report) by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Raytheon Company. (Orwig, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's First Amended Complaint (Orwig, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's First Amended Complaint filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Dana Johnson re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's Complaint (Sanford, Brian)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Dana Johnson filed by Dana Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanford, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/19/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/22/2018) (epm)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Raytheon Company re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's Complaint (Orwig, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff-Relator's Complaint filed by Raytheon Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orwig, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint. Raytheon Company answer due 10/12/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/7/2018) (zkc)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Agreed Motion to Extend Defendant Raytheon Company's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Raytheon Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew D Orwig added to party Raytheon Company(pty:dft) (Orwig, Matthew) Modified text on 9/7/2018 (rekc).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Raytheon Company. (zkc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Dana Johnson. (Sanford, Brian)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2018) (ndt)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Clayton Ray Mahaffey-DOJ for United States of America added, Lindsey E Beran-DOJ terminated. (ran)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dana Johnson. (twd)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Raytheon Company filed by Dana Johnson. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number 099567) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (twd)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Raytheon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Johnson
Represented By: Brian P Sanford
Represented By: David Bryan Norris
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Clayton Ray Mahaffey-DOJ
Represented By: Lindsey E Beran-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: Amy Jeffress
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: Charles A Blanchard
Represented By: Robine Kirsty Morrison Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?