Davis v. Capital One Home Loans, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeffrey Davis |
Defendant: |
Capital One Home Loans LLC and Capital One National Association |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv03236 |
Filed: |
November 28, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
A. Joe Fish |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 20, 2020 |
Filing
127
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 124 (Document Restricted) Joint Consent Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal). The court declines to rule on the parties' 125 motion for approval of the settlement agr eement, however, until the court has considered and acted upon the parties' response to this memorandum opinion and order. The parties are ORDERED to file their response, stating whether they continue to request approval of the settlement agreement, by no later than 6/3/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/20/2020) (aaa)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
104
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Capital One's 68 motion to amend is DENIED and Davis's request for equitable tolling is DENIED. In addition, Capital One shall provide Davis with the applicable list of all individuals who have originated loan products regardless of job title within the United States at any time during the last three years. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/6/2019) (axm)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 30 motion for conditional certification is GRANTED. The defendants' 37 objections are OVERRULED and their 37 motion to strike is DENIED. The parties shall confer in an attempt to resolve thei r remaining disagreements, as discussed above. No later than 14 days from the date of this memorandum opinion and order, the plaintiff shall electronically file either (1) a joint proposed class notice, and include a separate document detailing the additional agreed upon information described above, or (2) a motion for approval of an opposed notice, and include a separate document containing the plaintiff's proposals. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/2/2018) (zkc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?