Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts et al v. Adams et al
Appellee: Patrick Taylor Adams and Linda Ann Adams
Not Classified By Court: Case Admin Sup and Stacey G Jernigan
Appellant: Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Case Number: 3:2018cv00727
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Appearance in Lead Counsel For The Texas Comptroller Of Public Accounts and Request For Notice and Request To Be Added To Mailing Matrix filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Obaldo, Rachel)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Starks, Jason)
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 Appellee's BRIEF by Linda Ann Adams, Patrick Taylor Adams. (Olson, Dennis)
June 1, 2018 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Starks, Jason)
May 3, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of transmission of COMPLETE bankruptcy record on appeal for #bankruptcy case number 15-35093. Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record Vol. 1, #2 Appellant Record Vol. 2) (Blanco - TXNB, Juan)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Starks, Jason)
March 27, 2018 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (axm)
March 27, 2018 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 15-35093 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:18-cv-727. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal, appealed order 143 and supporting documentation) (Blanco - TXNB, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts et al v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick Taylor Adams
Represented By: Dennis O Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Linda Ann Adams
Represented By: Dennis O Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By: Jason A Starks
Represented By: Rachel R Obaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?