United States of America v. Donica
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tiffany M Donica
Case Number: 3:2018cv01828
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excludes Veterans)
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Tiffany M Donica filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Ray, Doug)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tiffany M Donica. (zkc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tiffany M Donica ; served on 8/9/2018. (Ray, Doug)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Substituted Service: Plaintiff is authorized to serve Defendant, Tiffany M. Donica, by: (1) mailing to Donica by registered or certified mail, return receipt requested, a true copy of the summons with a copy of the complaint attached; and (2) attaching (in a reasonably secure manner) a true copy of the summons and complaint to the front door of Donica's usual place of abode at 1153 West Hills Terrace, Saginaw, Texas 76179. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/8/2018) (sss)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Substituted Service filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Ray, Doug)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tiffany M Donica. (rekc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/16/2018) (rekc).
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tiffany M. Donica filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ray, Doug) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened PDF on 7/16/2018) (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Donica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany M Donica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Doug W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?