Daniel v. UT Southwestern Health Systems
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn M. Daniel and Gwendolyn M Daniel
Defendant: UT Southwestern Health Systems and UT Southwestern Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv01868
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UT Southwestern Medical Center. Waiver sent on 8/10/2018. (Calhoun, Laura)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal Voluntary Partial Dismissal of UT Southwestern Health Systems filed by Gwendolyn M Daniel (Calhoun, Laura)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to UT Southwestern Medical Center. (axm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against UT Southwestern Health Systems, UT Southwestern Medical Center filed by Gwendolyn M Daniel. Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Calhoun, Laura)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to UT Southwestern Health Systems; served on 7/24/2018. (Calhoun, Laura)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UT Southwestern Health Systems. (ran)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Gwendolyn M. Daniel. (Calhoun, Laura)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gwendolyn M. Daniel. (Calhoun, Laura)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against U.T. Southwestern Health Systems filed by Gwendolyn M. Daniel. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9327504) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Calhoun, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel v. UT Southwestern Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Southwestern Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Southwestern Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn M. Daniel
Represented By: Laura E Calhoun
Represented By: Baleigh B Walker
Represented By: John J Mongogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn M Daniel
Represented By: Laura E Calhoun
Represented By: Baleigh B Walker
Represented By: John J Mongogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?