United States of America v. $77,010 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $77,010 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Brian Onuoha and David Carter
Case Number: 3:2018cv01869
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian Onuoha. (Jumes, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Brian Onuoha. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jumes, Steven)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Claim filed by David Carter (Jumes, Steven)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 Verified Judicial Claim by Brian Onuoha. (Jumes, Steven)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Judicial Verified Claim by David Carter. (Jumes, Steven)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Todd Jumes on behalf of David Carter. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jumes, Steven)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Todd Jumes on behalf of Brian Onuoha. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jumes, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Publication re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Advertisement Certification Report) (Tindall-DOJ, Mark).
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Arrest Warrant for Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Tindall-DOJ, Mark)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $77,010 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Tindall-DOJ, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $77,010 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $77,010 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Joseph Tindall-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Onuoha
Represented By: Steven Todd Jumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Carter
Represented By: Steven Todd Jumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?