Weiner v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio
Plaintiff: Richard Henry Weiner
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio
Case Number: 3:2018cv01976
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Deportation
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Strike #6 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Blaire Bruns Johnson added to party Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio(pty:dft) (Johnson, Blaire)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Henry Weiner (Weiner, Richard)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), this case is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Renee Toliver for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/2/2018) (zkc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for Discovery filed by Richard Henry Weiner (Weiner, Richard)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Removal against Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio filed by Richard Henry Weiner. Removed from Justice of the Peace, Precinct 2 Place 2, JS1800012N. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS0109874) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa) Modified title to match document on 8/2/2018 (epm).
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiner v. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio
Represented By: Jennifer H Frank
Represented By: Blaire Bruns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Henry Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?