Maloney v. Forterra Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nancy G Maloney
Defendant: W. Matthew Brown, Kevin Barner, Grant Wilbeck, Forterra Inc, Clint McDonnough, Chadwick S Suss, Chris Meyer, Kyle S Volluz, Robert Corcoran, Samuel D Loughlin, Lori M Browne, William Kerfin, Jeffrey K Bradley, John McPherson and Jacques Sarrazin
Case Number: 3:2018cv01980
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Forterra Inc. (Zambrano, Angela)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Moving Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 11/16/2018; the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to any motion filed by a Moving Defendant in response to the Complaint is 1/22/2019; and the deadline for Moving Defendants to file and serve their reply brief(s) is 3/8/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/31/2018) (aaa)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary K. Blasy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/31/2018) (chmb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension of Time and for Extended Briefing Schedule filed by Kevin Barner, Jeffrey K Bradley, Lori M Browne, Robert Corcoran, Forterra Inc, Samuel D Loughlin, Clint McDonnough, John McPherson, Chris Meyer, Chadwick S Suss, Kyle S Volluz, Grant Wilbeck (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela C Zambrano on behalf of Kevin Barner, Jeffrey K Bradley, Lori M Browne, Robert Corcoran, Forterra Inc, Samuel D Loughlin, Clint McDonnough, John McPherson, Chris Meyer, Chadwick S Suss, Kyle S Volluz, Grant Wilbeck. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Zambrano, Angela)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yvette Ostolaza on behalf of Kevin Barner, Jeffrey K Bradley, Lori M Browne, Robert Corcoran, Forterra Inc, Samuel D Loughlin, Clint McDonnough, John McPherson, Chris Meyer, Chadwick S Suss, Kyle S Volluz, Grant Wilbeck. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ostolaza, Yvette)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yolanda Cornejo Garcia on behalf of Kevin Barner, Jeffrey K Bradley, Lori M Browne, Robert Corcoran, Forterra Inc, Samuel D Loughlin, Clint McDonnough, John McPherson, Chris Meyer, Chadwick S Suss, Kyle S Volluz, Grant Wilbeck. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Garcia, Yolanda)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Park on behalf of W. Matthew Brown, William Kerfin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Park, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle A Reed on behalf of W. Matthew Brown, William Kerfin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reed, Michelle)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Scott Barnard on behalf of W. Matthew Brown, William Kerfin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barnard, M)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to W. Matthew Brown. Waiver sent on 8/21/2018; William Kerfin. Waiver sent on 8/22/2018. (Blasy, Mary)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kevin Barner. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Jeffrey K Bradley. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Lori M Browne. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Robert Corcoran. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Forterra Inc. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Samuel D Loughlin. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Clint McDonnough. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; John McPherson. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Chris Meyer. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Chadwick S Suss. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Kyle S Volluz. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018; Grant Wilbeck. Waiver sent on 8/16/2018. (Blasy, Mary)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Nancy G Maloney (Blasy, Mary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:18-cv-1980-L. (epm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Mary K. Blasy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9357746) filed by Nancy G Maloney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bradley, Balon)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy G Maloney. (Bradley, Balon)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Nancy G Maloney. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9352257) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Verification) (Bradley, Balon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maloney v. Forterra Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Matthew Brown
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Daniel Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Barner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Wilbeck
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forterra Inc
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint McDonnough
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadwick S Suss
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Meyer
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle S Volluz
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Corcoran
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel D Loughlin
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori M Browne
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kerfin
Represented By: Michelle A Reed
Represented By: M Scott Barnard
Represented By: Daniel Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K Bradley
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McPherson
Represented By: Yolanda Cornejo Garcia
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques Sarrazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy G Maloney
Represented By: Balon B Bradley
Represented By: Mary K Blasy
Represented By: Curtis V Trinko
Represented By: Kenneth A Elan
Represented By: Samuel H Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?