Lovvorn v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ramona Lovvorn
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2018cv02041
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration, served on 8/21/2018; U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Texas, served on 8/14/2018; U.S. Attorney General, served on 8/23/2018. (zkc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS re: #5 Order, #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #4 Consent Form. Signed on 8/8/2018. (zkc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Commissioner Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint in the case to the U.S. Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/8/2018) (chmb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (zkc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ramona Lovvorn. (Scoggin, Steven)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ramona Lovvorn with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Scoggin, Steven)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security Administration filed by Ramona Lovvorn. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scoggin, Steven) Modified docket text on 8/7/2018 (zkc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovvorn v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Lovvorn
Represented By: Steven R Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?