Sievert v Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Plaintiff: Arlene Sievert
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Implantate AG, aap Biomaterials GmbH and aap Implants Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02175
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting #15 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that all claims in this matter by Plaintiff against Defendants aap Implantate AG and aap Implants, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with each party to bear her or its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/3/2018) (epm)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Proceed Without Designating Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/2/2018) (epm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Arlene Sievert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Wey, Kay)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 ***Pleases Disregard - Attorney to Refile Correct Image*** STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Arlene Sievert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Wey, Kay) Modified on 10/2/2018 (axm).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Roger Smith, III. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/1/2018) (epm)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J Duplechin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/1/2018) (epm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Proceed Without Designating Local Counsel filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Proceed Without Designating Local Counsel) (Williams, Gene)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Williams, Gene)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gene M Williams added to party Howmedica Osteonics Corporation(pty:dft) (Williams, Gene)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9477467) filed by Arlene Sievert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Ryan J Duplechin added to party Arlene Sievert(pty:pla) (Duplechin, Ryan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9477263 filed by Arlene Sievert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, William) Modified docket text to add payment information on 9/26/2018 (aaa).
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE ENTRY #7 FOR CORRECTED IMAGE*** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9477263) filed by Arlene Sievert (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney William Roger Smith, III added to party Arlene Sievert(pty:pla) (Smith, William) Modified on 9/26/2018 (aaa).
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Biomaterials GmbH, aap Implantate AG, aap Implants Inc. (sss)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Arlene Sievert. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Van Wey, Kay)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arlene Sievert. (Van Wey, Kay)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Biomaterials GmbH, aap Implantate AG, aap Implants, Inc. filed by Arlene Sievert. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9392856) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Van Wey, Kay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sievert v Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Wayne Walther
Represented By: Gene M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Implantate AG
Represented By: Katherine Swan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Biomaterials GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Implants Inc
Represented By: Katherine Swan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Sievert
Represented By: Kay L Van Wey
Represented By: Brady Williams
Represented By: Ryan J Duplechin
Represented By: William Roger Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?