Tipler v. Nancy A Berryhill
Plaintiff: David Tipler
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2018cv02245
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill; served on 9/5/2018; Attorney General; served on 9/7/2018; US Attorney; served on 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 US Attorney) (epm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #4 Consent, #6 Summons Issued, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint. Signed on 8/27/2018. (rekc)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for defendant, and deliver the summons and copies of the complaint and the notice of right to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge to the United States Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/27/2018) (axm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Tipler. (Skaar, Daniel) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (mcrd).
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Tipler. (Skaar, Daniel)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill filed by David Tipler. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Skaar, Daniel) Modified defendant on 8/24/2018 (mcrd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tipler v. Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tipler
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?