LG Montfort LLC v El Pollo Loco Inc
Plaintiff: LG Montfort LLC
Defendant: El Pollo Loco Inc
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2018cv02329
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jeff Kaplan as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/1/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/28/2018) (ndt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 2/10/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 5/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2019. Motions due by 11/12/2019. Discovery due by 10/14/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/1/2019. Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 1/27/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/28/2018) (ndt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by LG Montfort LLC. (Tobin, Aaron)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/28/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/7/2018) (svc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by El Pollo Loco Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Bateman, Conor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Notice of Removal against All Defendants filed by El Pollo Loco Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s)) (Bateman, Conor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-18-10224 filed by EL POLLO LOCO, INC.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9423712) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s)) (Bateman, Conor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG Montfort LLC v El Pollo Loco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Pollo Loco Inc
Represented By: David B Tabor
Represented By: Conor G Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG Montfort LLC
Represented By: Leah K Lanier
Represented By: Aaron Z Tobin
Represented By: Jared T S Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Represented By: Jeff Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?