Lanotte v. Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors LP et al
Plaintiff: Susan Lanotte
Defendant: HIGHLAND GLOBAL ALLOCATION FUND, Bob Froehlich, Timothy Hui, Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, LP, Ethan Powell, John Honis, Bryan Ward and Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv02360
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bryan Ward ; served on 10/18/2018. (ndt)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Highland Global Allocation Fund; served on 10/15/2018. (rekc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Bryan Ward. (epm)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Susan Lanotte. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Summons - Ethan Powell) (Steckler, Bruce)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (epm)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Susan Lanotte. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Summons - Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, LP, #2 Additional Page(s) Summons - Highland Global Allocation Fund, #3 Additional Page(s) Summons -Honis, #4 Additional Page(s) Summons - Hui, #5 Additional Page(s) Summons - Powell, #6 Additional Page(s) Summons - Ward) (Steckler, Bruce)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meagan Farmer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/18/2018) (epm)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James S Notis. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/17/2018) (epm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9445606) filed by Susan Lanotte (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Notis, James)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9442871) filed by Susan Lanotte (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Farmer, Meagan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Susan Lanotte. (Steckler, Bruce)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bob Froehlich, HIGHLAND GLOBAL ALLOCATION FUND, Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, LP, John Honis, Timothy Hui, Ethan Powell, Bryan Ward filed by Susan Lanotte. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9431350) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Steckler, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanotte v. Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHLAND GLOBAL ALLOCATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Honis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lanotte
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Meagan Farmer
Represented By: Jon T Pearson
Represented By: James S Notis
Represented By: Michael J Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?