Med-Cert Home Care, LLC v. Alex M Azar, II et al
Plaintiff: Med-Cert Home Care, LLC and Med-Cert Home Care LLC
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II and Seema Verma
Case Number: 3:2018cv02372
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE (Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) filed by Med-Cert Home Care LLC re: #17 Order (Price, Mark) Modified on 10/4/2018 to reflect title of document and correct document linkage (ctf).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall submit any such affidavits and/or depositions and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law annotated to the evidentiary record and relevant case law in this case by October 5, 2018. Defendants shall submit any Responses due by 11/6/2018. Plaintiff shall submit its reply by 11/21/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/24/2018) (ndt)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Med-Cert Home Care LLC (Price, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #6 Motion for TRO. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/19/2018) (epm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2018 re #6 Emergency Motion and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Mark E. Price; Defense - Sarah E. Delaney. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:55. (lag/chmb)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit any such affidavits and/or depositions and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law annotated to the evidentiary record and relevant case law in this case by 9/28/2018. Responses due by 10/30/2018. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/19/2018) (epm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma. (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ on behalf of Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #6 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2018 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1310, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/17/2018) (axm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alex M Azar, II ; served on 9/12/2018; Seema Verma ; served on 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (epm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Med-Cert Home Care LLC re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - L) (axm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by Med-Cert Home Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (axm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Med-Cert Home Care, LLC. (axm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Exhibits A - L) to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Med-Cert Home Care LLC. (axm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2018: #1 Envelope) (axm).
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Seema Verma, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sss)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Med-Cert Home Care, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9435413) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Price, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Med-Cert Home Care, LLC v. Alex M Azar, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med-Cert Home Care, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med-Cert Home Care LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?