JMJ Florida Holdings LLC et al v. GiGi's Cupcakes LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jodi McGaharan, Kevin McGaharan and JMJ Florida Holdings LLC
Defendant: Sovrano LLC, Gigi's Operating LLC, Food Business Services LLC, Gina Butler, Gigi's Holdings LLC, Gigi's Franchising LLC, GiGi's Cupcakes LLC, KeyCorp LLC, Alan Thompson and FundCorp Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02381
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to supplement the record on or before Thursday, 11/15/2018, and identify the citizenship of the members of the LLCs involved in this action and demonstrate why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/1/2018) (zkc)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/29/2018) (zkc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION Substituted Service filed by Kevin McGaharan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Service, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gigi's Holdings LLC; served on 10/12/2018. (Cohen, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/22/2018 to enhance text (dss).
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gigi's Franchising LLC ; served on 10/13/2018. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gina Butler ; served on 10/13/2018. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony A. Garcia. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/5/2018) (zkc)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Cohen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/5/2018) (zkc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Anthony Garcia (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9493038) filed by JMJ Florida Holdings LLC, Jodi McGaharan, Kevin McGaharan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Davis, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey Cohen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9493017) filed by JMJ Florida Holdings LLC, Jodi McGaharan, Kevin McGaharan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Davis, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Cohen, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Food Business Services LLC. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018; FundCorp Inc. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018; GiGi's Cupcakes LLC. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018; Gigi's Operating LLC. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018; KeyCorp LLC. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018; Sovrano LLC. Waiver sent on 10/2/2018. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall provide the Court with a courtesy copy of Exhibits A, B, C, and D of Plaintiffs' Original Complaint [Doc. #1 ] and all attachments on or before 3:00 p.m. on 10/3/2018. The courtesy copies should be delivered to the Court at the following address: 1205 Texas Avenue, Room C-210, Lubbock, Texas 79401. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/12/2018) (zkc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gina Butler, Food Business Services LLC, FundCorp Inc, GiGi's Cupcakes LLC, Gigi's Franchising LLC, Gigi's Holdings LLC, Gigi's Operating LLC, KeyCorp LLC, Sovrano LLC, Alan Thompson. (mcrd/ala)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JMJ Florida Holdings, LLC, Jodi McGaharan, Kevin McGaharan. (Davis, James)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kevin McGaharan, JMJ Florida Holdings, LLC, Jodi McGaharan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9436036) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D) (Davis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JMJ Florida Holdings LLC et al v. GiGi's Cupcakes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi McGaharan
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McGaharan
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMJ Florida Holdings LLC
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovrano LLC
Represented By: Deborah S Coldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Operating LLC
Represented By: Deborah S Coldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Business Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GiGi's Cupcakes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyCorp LLC
Represented By: Deborah S Coldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FundCorp Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?