Navient Solutions LLC v. Lewis
Plaintiff: Navient Solutions LLC
Defendant: Daniel Lewis
Petitioner: Navient Solutions, LLC f/k/a Navient Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02382
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #5 Notice of Dismissal. (zkc)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Navient Solutions LLC (Jobe, Jason)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Lewis filed by Navient Solutions LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A and B) (Jobe, Jason)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daniel Lewis. (epm)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD against Daniel Lewis filed by Navient Solutions, LLC f/k/a Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9436581) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Jobe, Jason) Modified text on 9/10/2018 (epm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navient Solutions LLC v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Navient Solutions, LLC f/k/a Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Ray Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navient Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jason Ray Jobe
Represented By: Thomas Annis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?