United States of America v. Daniels

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Linda Daniels
Case Number: 3:2018cv02384
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #8 Order. (zkc)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Adopting #7 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The United States' (IRS) Petition to Enforce IRS Summons is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that Respondent Linda Daniels appear before Revenue Officer Bernadette Letcher, or another officer of the Internal Revenue Service, at 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, on Tuesday, 9/25/2018, at 11:00 a.m., to testify to the matters specified in the summons attached to Exhibit "1" to the petition of the United States of America filed in this matter. All court costs are hereby taxed against Respondent. Any Revenue officer of the Internal Revenue Service is appointed to serve a copy of this order on Respondent. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/16/2018) (zkc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: the #1 United States' (IRS) Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. The Court recommends that the petition to enforce the summons be GRANTED, and that Respondent be ORDERED to appear before Revenue Officer Bernadette Letcher, or another officer of the Internal Revenue Service, at 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, on Tuesday, 9/25/2018, at 11:00 a.m., to testify to the matters specified in the summons attached to Exhibit "1" to the petition of the United States of America filed in this matter. The Court further recommends that all court costs be taxed against Respondent. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/25/2018) (mcrd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/25/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Stephanie M. Page, Kimberly Kazda. Defense - Linda Daniels, Pro Se. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (mcrd)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer,, Notice of Service (Page, Stephanie)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/25/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this order, together with the petition and the exhibits attached thereto, be served upon Respondent. This Court specially appoints IRS Revenue Agents Mark Doty and Bernadette Letcher, or any other proper officer of the Internal Revenue Service, to make such service and make due return to this Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/11/2018) (mcrd)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/10/2018) (chmb)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) Modified filed date on 9/7/2018 (axm).
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 USA's PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Cover Sheet) (Page, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie M. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?