Stone v. Vance et al

Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Stone
Defendant: Micheal J Saddler, John Doe, Dan Morales and John Vance
Case Number: 3:2018cv02397
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
0 Judge: David L Horan
1 Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 12 Transcript Order Form: re #11 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (zkc)
November 5, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-11379 in USCA5 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Alfred Lee Stone. (svc)
October 24, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. with TO Wed Oct 24 10:31:39 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 16, 2018 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit, received from the Fifth Circuit for processing in this office on 10/23/2018, by Alfred Lee Stone. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: #1 USCA5 Letter) (svc)
October 16, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT to Accompany Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Alfred Lee Stone. (rekc)
September 27, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Thu Sep 27 12:39:02 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 27, 2018 9 Featured Case JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under sanctions previously imposed against Plaintiff Alfred Lee Stone and under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/27/2018) (ndt)
September 27, 2018 8 Featured Case Order Accepting #6 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation re: #3 Complaint, filed by Alfred Lee Stone. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/27/2018) (ndt)
September 25, 2018 7 Specific Written OBJECTION to #6 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation by Alfred Lee Stone. (rekc)
September 12, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Sep 12 14:36:46 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 12, 2018 6 Featured Case FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should summarily dismiss this action without prejudice under sanctions previously imposed against Plaintiff Alfred Lee Stone and under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) unless, within the time for filing objections to this recommendation or by some other deadline established by the Court, Stone (1) obtains written permission from a judge of this Court or of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit to file an amended complaint and (2) pays the full filing fee of $400.00. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/12/2018) (sss)
September 11, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Sep 11 10:48:23 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Alfred Lee Stone. (sss)
September 10, 2018 4 REQUEST for Service and Filing Copies of Pleadings and Other Papers filed by Alfred Lee Stone. (sss)
September 10, 2018 3 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Dan Morales, Micheal J Saddler, John Vance filed by Alfred Lee Stone. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss)
September 10, 2018 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss)
September 10, 2018 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Vance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal J Saddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?