Boone v. Bowie County Texas et al

Plaintiff: Edward C Boone
Defendant: Matt Keil, Michael Bernoudy, Tina Petty, Randy Moore, Mark Elliott, Michael Friedman, Bowie County Texas, April Scoggins and Sherl Wilson
Case Number: 3:2018cv02438
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
0 Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
1 Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 20 MOTION to Dismiss and, subject thereto, Original Answer filed by Randy Moore. (zkc)
November 6, 2018 19 MOTION to Dismiss, and MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Michael Friedman. See #18 for image (svc)
November 6, 2018 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, and #10 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Friedman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, #10 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Michael Friedman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
November 5, 2018 17 RESPONSE filed by Edward C Boone re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndt)
November 5, 2018 16 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash filed by Tina Petty with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Montgomery, D)
November 1, 2018 15 Rule 12 MOtion to Dismiss and Subject Thereto ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, #10 Amended Complaint,,, filed by April Scoggins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss and Subject Thereto ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, #10 Amended Complaint,,, filed by April Scoggins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert M Hailey added to party April Scoggins(pty:dft) (Hailey, Robert)
October 29, 2018 14 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12 Motions to Dismiss filed by Tina Petty (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Proposed Order)Attorney D Randall Montgomery added to party Tina Petty(pty:dft) (Montgomery, D)
October 25, 2018 13 Summons Issued as to Sherl Wilson. (axm)
October 23, 2018 12 Rule 12(b) MOTION to Dismiss and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer filed by Mark Elliott. (rekc)
October 18, 2018 11 Contesting Application for Sale of Real Estate filed by Edward C Boone. (epm)
October 18, 2018 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Michael Bernoudy, Bowie County Texas, Mark Elliott, Michael Friedman, Matt Keil, Randy Moore, Tina Petty, April Scoggins, Sherl Wilson filed by Edward C Boone. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) ( #1 Additional Pages Restricted to Case Participants per Judge Rutherford's Oral Directive on 10/24/18) (ali).
October 15, 2018 9 Notice to Remove/Withdraw #6 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Edward C Boone. (aaa) Modified title on 10/24/2018 (ctf).
October 15, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Matt Keil. (Keil, Donald) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened image on 10/16/2018) (ajb).
October 15, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer to #2 Complaint filed by Matt Keil. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Donald Mattson Keil added to party Matt Keil(pty:dft) (Keil, Donald) Modified event type and docket text on 10/16/2018 (ajb).
September 21, 2018 6 ***WITHDRAWN PER #9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL*** MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Edward C Boone. (ykp) Modified on 10/24/2018 (ctf).
September 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 5. Fri Sep 14 09:18:15 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 13, 2018 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
September 13, 2018 Document Mailed: #4 Summons to Bowie County mailed to Edward Boone on 9/13/2018. (svc)
September 13, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Bernoudy, Bowie County Texas, Mark Elliott, Michael Friedman, Matt Keil, Randy Moore, Tina Petty, April Scoggins. (mcrd/ala) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2018: #1 Bowie Summons) (svc).
September 13, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edward C Boone. (mcrd/ala)
September 13, 2018 2 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Michael Bernoudy, Bowie County Texas, Mark Elliott, Michael Friedman, Matt Keil, Randy Moore, Tina Petty, April Scoggins filed by Edward C Boone. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS110771) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mcrd/ala)
September 13, 2018 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. Bowie County Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Keil
Represented By: Donald Mattson Keil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bernoudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Petty
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Barreneche
Represented By: D Randall Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowie County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Scoggins
Represented By: Robert M Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherl Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?