Roe v. Johnson County et al
Plaintiff: John Roe
Defendant: Richard Alford, Philip Roden, Robert Matson, Ivan Alvarado, Two Unknown Ice Agents, Stu Madison, McLennan County Sheriff's Office, Jeffery Acklen, Jane Doe, Adam King, Jack Harwell, NFN Flores, LaSalle Management Company LLC, NFN Nolles, Johnson County Sheriff's Office, Randall Price, Parnell McNamara, Jacob Aguilar, Eddie Williams, David Blankenship, Joel Macias, Johnson County, Southwestern Correctional LLC, Bill Moore, Judge Robert Mayfield, John Does 1-3 and Bob Alford
Case Number: 3:2018cv02497
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Philip Roden ; served on 11/2/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bob Alford ; served on 9/26/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Southwestern Correctional LLC ; served on 9/29/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Randall Price ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bill Moore ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Parnell McNamara ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Robert Mayfield ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Robert Matson ; served on 10/27/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stu Madison ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LaSalle Management Company LLC ; served on 10/1/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Adam King ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Johnson County ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David Blankenship ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ivan Alvarado ; served on 10/1/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Alford ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bob Alford ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jacob Aguilar ; served on 10/1/2018. (Roe, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeffery Acklen ; served on 9/28/2018. (Roe, John)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING BRIEFING ORDER AND EXTENDING DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: The Court set a briefing schedule as to that motion, see Dkt. No. #22 , which the Court now VACATES. To streamline the Court's consideration of the Defendants' various responses to the complaint, and to the lessen the burden on the pro se plaintiff, the Court now sets 11/30/2018 as the deadline for the Johnson County Defendants, the LaSalle Defendants, and Defendants Price, Williams, Matson, Roden, and Richard Alford to respond to the complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/9/2018) (axm)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***VACATED PER #23 ORDER*** ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: #21 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/5/2018. Replies due by 12/20/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/5/2018) (zkc) Modified on 11/5/2018 (mcrd). Modified on 11/9/2018 (axm).
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McLennan County Sheriff's Office, Parnell McNamara (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brandt, Thomas)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #4 Complaint. Richard Alford answer due 11/30/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/2/2018) (zkc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Richard Alford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Richard Alford(pty:dft) (Moos, Marvin)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Robert Matson, Philip Roden and Eddie Williams answer due 11/27/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/25/2018) (ndt) Modified on 10/29/2018 (mcrd).
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Robert Matson, Philip Roden, Eddie Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Return Mail for Williams, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Return Mail for Matson, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Return Mail for Roden, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Robert Matson(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Philip Roden(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Eddie Williams(pty:dft) (Moos, Marvin)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint. The Court, finding good cause, GRANTS the LaSalle Defendants' motion and extends their deadline to respond to the complaint to 11/21/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/23/2018) (ykp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Return Mail for Williams, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Return Mail for Matson, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Return Mail for Roden, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party LaSalle Management Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Southwestern Correctional LLC(pty:dft) (Moos, Marvin)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court, finding good cause, GRANTS the motion and extends his deadline to respond to the complaint to 11/19/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/22/2018) (ykp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Randall Price Attorney Glynis Lori Zavarelli added to party Randall Price(pty:dft) (Zavarelli, Glynis)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 , #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court, finding good cause, therefore GRANTS the motions Dkt. Nos. #9 & #11 and extends the deadline for the McLennan County Defendants to respond to the complaint to 11/2/2018 and the deadline for the Johnson County Defendants to respond to the complaint to 11/16/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/16/2018) (aaa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Verified Complaint filed by Jeffery Acklen, David Blankenship, Johnson County, Adam King, Stu Madison, Robert Mayfield, Bill Moore, Bob Alford. (Blaies, Grant) Modified filer on 10/15/2018 (ykp). Modified text to add Bob Alford on 10/23/2018 (axm).
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F Roehm, III on behalf of McLennan County Sheriff's Office, Parnell McNamara. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roehm, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by McLennan County Sheriff's Office, Parnell McNamara (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas P Brandt added to party McLennan County Sheriff's Office(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Brandt added to party Parnell McNamara(pty:dft) (Brandt, Thomas)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/25/2018) (rekc)
September 20, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 3. Thu Sep 20 10:05:20 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Jacob Aguilar, Ivan Alvarado, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffery Acklen, Richard Alford, David Blankenship, Johnson County, Johnson County Sheriff's Office, Adam King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Stu Madison, Robert Matson, Robert Mayfield, Parnell McNamara, Bill Moore, Randall Price, Philip Roden, Southwestern Correctional LLC, Eddie Williams. (ykp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Roe. Signed by VanDamme Valentin Jeanty (ykp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by John Roe. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS110902) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Signed by VanDamme Valentin Jeanty (ykp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD***Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp) Modified on 9/20/2018 (ykp).
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Johnson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Alford
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Roden
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Matson
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Ice Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Madison
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLennan County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: John F Roehm, III
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Acklen
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam King
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Management Company LLC
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Nolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Price
Represented By: Glynis Lori Zavarelli
Represented By: Michelle Leigh Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell McNamara
Represented By: John F Roehm, III
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Williams
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blankenship
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Correctional LLC
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Moore
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert Mayfield
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Alford
Represented By: Jennifer Holland Litke
Represented By: Grant D Blaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?