McDonald v. JetPay Payment Services TX LLC

Plaintiff: Hugh McDonald
Defendant: JetPay Payment Services TX LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02498
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On November 26, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., the Court will conduct a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) pretrial scheduling conference in Courtroom 1561, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242. Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel must attend in person. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/13/2018.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/13/2018) (zkc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT [Joint Rule 26(f) Status Report] filed by Hugh McDonald. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/18/2018) (lag/chmb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetPay Payment Services TX LLC. (Rickman, Robert)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by JetPay Payment Services TX LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert L Rickman added to party JetPay Payment Services TX LLC(pty:dft) (Rickman, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2018 (mcrd).
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to JetPay Payment Services TX LLC ; served on 9/21/2018. (ndt)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JetPay Payment Services TX LLC. (sss)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hugh McDonald. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against JetPay Payment Services TX, LLC filed by Hugh McDonald. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9462464) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. JetPay Payment Services TX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh McDonald
Represented By: Nicholas O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetPay Payment Services TX LLC
Represented By: Brian W Clark
Represented By: Jaime M DeWees
Represented By: Robert L Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?