Schorr v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert Schorr and Donna Hulshouser
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Implants Inc, aap Implantate AG and aap Biomaterials GmbH
Case Number: 3:2018cv02595
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (chmb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed Without Designating Local Counsel filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Howmedica Osteonics Corporation to Proceed Without Designatng Local Counsel) (Walther, Benjamin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. (Walther, Benjamin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Walther, Benjamin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:18-cv-2595-N. (zkc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Biomaterials GmbH, aap Implantate AG, aap Implants Inc. (ajb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Donna Hulshouser, Robert Schorr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons) (Van Wey, Kay)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donna Hulshouser, Robert Schorr. (Van Wey, Kay)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, aap Biomaterials GmbH, aap Implantate AG, aap Implants Inc filed by Robert Schorr, Donna Hulshouser. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9483290) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons) (Van Wey, Kay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schorr v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Wayne Walther
Represented By: Gene M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Implants Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Implantate AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aap Biomaterials GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schorr
Represented By: Kay L Van Wey
Represented By: Brady Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hulshouser
Represented By: Kay L Van Wey
Represented By: Brady Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?