Gee v. State of Texas et al
Petitioner: Steve S Gee, Jr.
Respondent: Stacey D Gee and State of Texas
Case Number: 3:2018cv02681
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Willful First Amendment Retaliation and Clear Fraud Upon the Court, Rule 60(b) MOTION to Set Aside Judgment for Clear Fraud Upon the Court by Judicial Officers, and Notice of Tort Claims filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Stacey D Gee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: Attorney fee Affidavit, #2 Exhibit(s) B: Admonish to Steve Gee) (Fernandez, Brandi)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: On 10/19/2018, the Court remanded this action to state court and also determined that Stacey D. Gee is entitled to cost and actual expenses, including reasonable attorney's fees. Ms. Gee must file a proper motion to support her request by 11/21/2018. And Steve Samuel Gee, Jr., the party who removed this action to federal court, must file a response to that motion no later than 12/6/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/22/2018) (axm)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: This action is again REMANDED to the 422nd District Court in Kaufman County, Texas. The court also imposes the following SANCTION on Mr. Gee: He may not again file a notice of removal as to this proceeding in this court or any other federal court without first requesting and obtaining the written approval of a United States district or magistrate judge. His violation of this sanction will subject him to monetary sanctions to be determined by the court. Further, it is ORDERED that Stacey D. Gee is awarded costs and actual expenses, including reasonable attorneys fees, under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). And, under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the amount of such costs and actual expenses, including attorneys fees, to be awarded to Ms. Gee under Section 1447(c) is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for findings and recommendation under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). The court retains jurisdiction over the determination of this award, but it otherwise remands the case. The clerk of court shall effect the remand according to the usual procedure. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/19/2018) (axm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Stacey D Gee (Fernandez, Brandi)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 Additional documents/exhibit filed by Stacey D Gee re: #3 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supplemental G to Motion for Remand) (Fernandez, Brandi) Modified on 10/12/2018 to enhance text (dss).
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Stacey D Gee re: #3 Notice of Removal, and MOTION to Strike and/or Remand and Request for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) to Motion to Remand) (Fernandez, Brandi) Modified to add motion event on 10/12/2018 (zkc).
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Judicial Disqualifications filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Petition; and, Verified Petition for Warrant of Removal filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Constitutional Questions to Texas State Statutory Schemes filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Constitutional Questions to Federal Statue 28 USC 1443 filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum of Law Clarifying Established Federal Jurisdiction filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of of Pre-Emptive Constitutional Challenge to the Unlawful Discrimination of Separate Racial Classes filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Steve S. Gee Jr upon Widespread Corruption by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Pro Se Litigant Rights filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Required Hearing on the Same Issues filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Pending Amendment of Petition into Complaint filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance (CIVIL) filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Notice Distinguishing Between the Two Basic Types of Removal; and, MOTION for Issuance of Preliminary Relief in the Alternatives filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 422nd District Court of Kaufman County, TX, case number 96435-422 filed by Steve S Gee, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gee v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stacey D Gee
Represented By: Brandi H Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve S Gee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?