Gillihan v. Skillman Plaza LLC

Plaintiff: Anthony Gillihan
Defendant: Skillman Plaza LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02708
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 12 RESPONSE filed by Anthony Gillihan re: #6 First MOTION for More Definite Statement Or In the Alternative MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,,,, Paragraphs 1, 3, 4, 6, 9, 10, 12, 16, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, and 42 (Schapiro, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Motion for Reconsideration. Response to #6 12(e) Motion due 12/12/2018. The Court's Order of 11/27/2018 is hereby VACATED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/6/2018) (zkc)
December 3, 2018 10 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Skillman Plaza LLC re: #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,, Order on Motion to Strike, #6 First MOTION for More Definite Statement Or In the Alternative MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,,,, Paragraphs 1, 3, 4, 6, (Song, Tailim)
November 29, 2018 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,, Order on Motion to Strike, #6 First MOTION for More Definite Statement Or In the Alternative MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,,,, Paragraphs 1, 3, 4, 6, 9, 10, 12, 16, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, and 42 filed by Anthony Gillihan with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 27, 2018 8 Featured Case ***VACATED PER #11 ORDER*** ORDER granting #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff provide a more definite statement as it relates to the allegations of ADA and ADAAG violations asserted against Defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with all pleading requirements and provide a more definite statement within 14 days from the date of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/27/2018) (ykp) Modified on 12/6/2018 (zkc).
November 25, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Skillman Plaza LLC ; served on 11/8/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 6 First MOTION for More Definite Statement Or In the Alternative, MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,,,, Paragraphs 1, 3, 4, 6, 9, 10, 12, 16, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, and 42 () filed by Skillman Plaza LLC. Party Skillman Plaza LLC added.Attorney Tailim Song added to party Skillman Plaza LLC(pty:dft) (Song, Tailim)
October 12, 2018 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
October 12, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Skillman Plaza LLC. (ajb)
October 12, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Anthony Gillihan. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthony Gillihan. (Schapiro, Douglas)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Skillman Plaza LLC filed by Anthony Gillihan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9512249) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Schapiro, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 10/12/2018) (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillihan v. Skillman Plaza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gillihan
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas S Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skillman Plaza LLC
Represented By: Tailim Song
Represented By: Jordan Timothy Whiddon
Represented By: Jennifer C. Ohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?