Garrett v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Jean Garrett, Marsalis Avenue Baptist Church, Anthony R Garrett, Eddie Tucker, Jane Runnels, Antonio Hernandez and Antonia Hernandez
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank, Walter L. Irvin, New Home Solution and Investment, Cederic Lydelle Brown, U.S. Department of Justice, American Dream and Educational Concepts, Ray McDonard, Eric Odom, Robert Ashley, Charles C Gumm, III, Alejandro Martinez, Walter L Irvin, Heaven 97 Khun, Cedric Brown and Pastor Robert O Moffett
Case Number: 3:2018cv02726
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Fri Nov 30 12:30:14 CST 2018 (crt)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: Plaintiff Wanda Jean Garrett's amended complaint [Dkt. No. #10 ] - and thus her action is DISMISSED with prejudice for her failure to state a claimon which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/30/2018) (axm)
November 30, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri Nov 30 12:28:43 CST 2018 (crt)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ACCEPTING #11 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/30/2018) (axm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #11 Findings and Recommendations by Robert O Moffett. (ndt)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #11 Findings and Recommendations by Wanda Jean Garrett (rekc)
October 26, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 11. Fri Oct 26 16:46:19 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss Plaintiff Wanda Jean Garrett's amended complaint [Dkt. No. #10 ] and thus her action with prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/26/2018) (zkc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Robert Ashley, BBVA Compass Bank, Charles C Gumm, III, Heaven 97 Khun, Walter L. Irvin, Alejandro Martinez, Ray McDonard, Moffitt, Eric Odom, Cedric Brown filed by Eddie L Tucker, Wanda Jean Garrett, Antonio Hernandez, Anthony R Garrett, Antonia Hernandez, Marsalis Avenue Baptist Church, Jane Ann Runnels. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
October 16, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Oct 16 16:57:30 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Wanda Jean Garrett must address the following deficiency: The complaint presently submitted is subject to summary dismissal for failure to comply with the applicable pleading standards Plaintiff Wanda Jean Garretts various claims labeled as allegations merely state legal conclusions. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 11/15/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/16/2018) (Attachments: #1 Civil Complaint Form) (epm)
October 15, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. NEF of clerk's note regarding case transfer also mailed. Mon Oct 15 16:54:05 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
October 15, 2018 New case number 3:18-cv-2726-N Garrett v. U.S. Department of Justice et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:18-cv-838-O. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ctf)
October 15, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Mon Oct 15 14:58:23 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order transferring case to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/15/2018) (npk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/15/2018) (npk)
October 11, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Thu Oct 11 08:51:58 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wanda Jean Garrett. (bdb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against American Dream and Educational Concepts, BBVA Compass Bank, Cederic Lydelle Brown, New Home Solution and Investment, U.S. Department of Justice filed by Wanda Jean Garrett. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Home Solution and Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cederic Lydelle Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Dream and Educational Concepts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Gumm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heaven 97 Khun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor Robert O Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jean Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsalis Avenue Baptist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?