Runnels v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jane Ann Runnels, Jane Reed Runnels and Jane Runnels
Defendant: Cedric Lydelle Brown, New Home Solution and Investment, American Dream and Educational Concepts, BBVA Compass Bank, Walter L Irvin, Ray McDonald, Cedric Brown and Charles C Guimm, III
Case Number: 3:2018cv02727
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/29/2018) (axm)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Accepting #11 Findings and Recommendation. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/29/2018) (axm)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 11/6/2018) (zkc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BBVA Compass Bank, Cedric Brown, Walter L Irvin, Ray McDonald, Charles C Guimm, III filed by Jane Reed Runnels. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jane Ann Runnels must address the following deficiency: Complaint is not in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/24/2018) (Attachments: #1 Civil Procedure 8) (ykp)
October 16, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Oct 16 15:07:20 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 15, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Oct 15 16:28:07 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 15, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Mon Oct 15 16:27:23 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
October 15, 2018 New case number 3:18-cv-2727-M Runnels v. BBVA Compass Bank et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 4:18-cv-837-O. Future filings should be made in the DALLAS division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ctf)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order transferring case to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/15/2018) (bcr)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No Summons shall issue unless authorized by further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/15/2018) (bcr)
October 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Wed Oct 10 14:46:29 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bcr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bcr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jane Reed Runnels (bcr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against American Dream and Educational Concepts, BBVA Compass Bank, Cedric Lydelle Brown, New Home Solution and Investment filed by Jane Reed Runnels. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bcr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnels v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Lydelle Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Home Solution and Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Dream and Educational Concepts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Guimm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Ann Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Reed Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?