MEC Resources LLC v. Vishay Americas Inc

Plaintiff: MEC Resources LLC
Defendant: Vishay Americas Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02770
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/11/2018) (svc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael R Ellis on behalf of Vishay Americas Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ellis, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vishay Americas Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. for Vishay Americas Inc, Vishay Americas Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Vishay Americas Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against MEC Resources LLC filed by Vishay Americas Inc (McNabnay, Neil)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD/FILED IN WRONG CASE*** USMS Process Receipt and Return re #5 Summons Issued. Commissioner served on 11/5/2018; Attorney General served on 11/5/2018; US Attorney served on 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 US Attorney) (epm) Modified on 11/13/2018 (zkc).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Vishay Americas Inc's response to the complaint is due 12/10/2018. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/2/2018) (chmb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Vishay Americas Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Neil J McNabnay added to party Vishay Americas Inc(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil)
October 18, 2018 Judge David C Godbey added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vishay Americas Inc. (epm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (epm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MEC Resources, LLC. (Katz, Robert)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Vishay Americas Inc filed by MEC Resources, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9523781) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - U.S. Patent No. 6,137,390) (Katz, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEC Resources LLC v. Vishay Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishay Americas Inc
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Michael R Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEC Resources LLC
Represented By: Robert David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?