AIG Seguros Mexico SA de CV v. Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: AIG Seguros Mexico SA de CV
Defendant: Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc and Sefar Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02793
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Status Conference is reset for 1/16/2019 10:00 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/13/2018) (chmb)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Per request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/25/2019 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/12/2018) (chmb)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/7/2019 09:30 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2018) (chmb)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/14/2018) (epm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura D Schmidt on behalf of AIG Seguros Mexico SA de CV. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schmidt, Laura)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sefar Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jacobs, Annie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc. (Liles, Todd)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Liles, Todd)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 (See docket entry #1 for image.) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sefar Inc. (epm) Modified filer on 10/23/2018 (zkc).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from D-95 Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-13556 filed by Sefar Inc.(Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9529123) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) E-1, #7 Exhibit(s) E-2, #8 Exhibit(s) E-3, #9 Exhibit(s) E-4, #10 Exhibit(s) E-5, #11 Exhibit(s) E-6, #12 Exhibit(s) E-7, #13 Exhibit(s) E-8, #14 Exhibit(s) E-9, #15 Exhibit(s) E-10, #16 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Persons) (Jacobs, Annie) Modified Jury Demand on 10/19/2018 (mcrd/ala).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Seguros Mexico SA de CV v. Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Manufacturing Co Inc
Represented By: Todd J Liles
Represented By: Kirk D Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sefar Inc
Represented By: Annie Jo Jacobs
Represented By: Zachary Watson Thomas
Represented By: Elizabeth Fitzgerald Griffin
Represented By: Bijan Ralf Siahatgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Seguros Mexico SA de CV
Represented By: Charles T Kelly
Represented By: Laura D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?