Correra v. New Mexico State Investment Counsel
Undetermined: Stacey G Jernigan and Case Admin Sup
Appellee: New Mexico State Investment Counsel
Appellant: Marc Anthony Correra
Case Number: 3:2018cv02811
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by New Mexico State Investment Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Withdraw) (Jacobsen, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Marc Anthony Correra (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hesse, Gregory)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This case was filed in this Court on October 23, 2018. It has come to the Court's attention that one of Appellee's counsel, James Casey Jacobsen is not admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Therefore, within 20 days from the date of this order, counsel for Appellee must either become admitted to practice in this District (See LR 83.7), or move the Court to be admitted Pro Hac Vice (See LR 83.9(b)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/30/2018) (chmb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for #bankruptcy case number 16-30728. Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)
October 23, 2018 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (zkc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 16-30728 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:18-cv-2811. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documentation) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correra v. New Mexico State Investment Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Mexico State Investment Counsel
Represented By: Jarom Joseph Yates
Represented By: James Casey Jacobsen
Represented By: Stephen M Pezanosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marc Anthony Correra
Represented By: Gregory Getty Hesse
Represented By: Peter S Partee, Sr
Represented By: Adam Corey Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?