Fractus, S.A. v. ZTE Corporation et al

Petitioner: Fractus SA
Respondent: ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc and ZTE Corporation
Special Master: Special Master
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2018cv02838
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 134 Payment for #116 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575721) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. ($25; Receipt number 0539-9622554). (Chen, Gang)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: The Court hereby appoints Daniel Denton as Special Master for this proceeding to perform the duties of an adjunct law clerk and technical advisor. The Court further removes Scott E. Woloson as technical adviser for this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/29/2018) (zkc)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #122 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alden Harris. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/27/2018) (chmb)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #121 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blaine Larson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/27/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael F. Heim. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #119 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie V. Payne. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #116 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gang Chen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #115 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David P. Linder. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #114 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey J. Catalano. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #113 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Sobieraj. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #112 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrea Shoffstall. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/15/2018) (chmb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 123 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/9/2018) filed by Fractus SA (Larson, Blaine)
November 14, 2018 Filing 122 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9584418) filed by Fractus SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Harris, Alden)
November 14, 2018 Filing 121 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9584304) filed by Fractus SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Larson, Blaine)
November 14, 2018 Filing 120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582714) filed by Fractus SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Heim, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 119 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9582560) filed by Fractus SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Payne, Leslie)
November 14, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ophelia F Camina on behalf of Fractus SA. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Camina, Ophelia)
November 9, 2018 Filing 117 (Document Restricted) ZTE (USA) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/9/2018) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Shoffstall, Andrea)
November 9, 2018 Filing 116 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575721) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Proposed Order) (Chen, Gang)
November 9, 2018 Filing 115 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575712) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Proposed Order) (Lindner, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 114 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575681) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Proposed Order) (Catalano, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2018 Filing 113 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575666) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Proposed Order) (Sobieraj, James)
November 9, 2018 Filing 112 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9575637) filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Proposed Order) (Shoffstall, Andrea)
November 7, 2018 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZTE (USA) Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Shenzhen Zhongxingxin Telecommunications Equipment Company Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate HKSCC Nominees Limited for ZTE (USA) Inc. (Taylor, Keana)
November 7, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Keana Theresa Taylor added to party ZTE (USA) Inc(pty:res) (Taylor, Keana)
October 24, 2018 Filing 109 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (rekc) (Main Document 109 replaced on 10/24/2018) (rekc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 108 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 107 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00561. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. ORDERS the deadline to serve rebuttal expert reports extended up to and including October 22, 2018 and STAYS all other deadlines pending transfer to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/4/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 105 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Dismiss the Court GRANTS the ZTE Defendants requested relief and ORDERS this case TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/18. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 103 REPORT of Mediation by William Joseph Cornelius. Mediation result: IMPASSE(Cornelius, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 102 REDACTION to #98 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production from Defendant ZTE (USA), Inc. by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Alarcon, Guillermo) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 19, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 101, Opposed Motion to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 101 ***FILED IN ERROR***Opposed MOTION to Compel Production from Defendant ZTE (USA), Inc. - REDACTED by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Alarcon, Guillermo) Modified on 9/19/2018 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE by Fractus, S.A. of Disclosure of Opening Expert Reports (Harris, Alden) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance with Service of Expert Disclosures (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 98 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production from Defendant ZTE (USA), Inc. by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Alarcon, Guillermo) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/17/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/28/18 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 10/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2018. (sholmes, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/10/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/7/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 8/28/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order for Extension of Time to Comply with the Deadline to Complete Mediation. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order for Extension to Complete Mediation by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 89 Joint P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David P Lindner on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6896742. (Lindner, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gang Chen on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6895679. (Chen, Gang) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - Court hereby appoints Mr. Scott E. Woloson as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/11/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 85 REPLY to #77 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blaine A. Larson, #2 Revised Exhibit D, #3 Revised Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit V)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 84 REDACTION to #83 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Shoffstall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 5)(Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 83 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Shoffstall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 82 RESPONSE to #77 Claim Construction Brief, filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Shoffstall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 81 REDACTION to #80 Sealed Response to Motion, by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blaine A. Larson, #2 Exhibit C)(Harris, Alden) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 80 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blaine A. Larson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE by Fractus, S.A. of Compliance Regarding Substantially Complete Document Production and Privilege Log Exchange (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc. (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 77 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alden G. Harris, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U)(Harris, Alden) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Notice of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE by Fractus, S.A. Submission of Technology Tutorial (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection set for 2/4/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 9/11/2018., Markman Hearing set for 8/28/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 12/17/2018., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Venue Briefing. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Venue Briefing by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 71 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Agreed and Disputed Terms)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against ZTE (USA) Inc., filed by Fractus, S.A..(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/10/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fractus, S.A. re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fractus, S.A. re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Sobieraj on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Sobieraj, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SUPPLEMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting #61 Motion for Protective Order (Supplement). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/23/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Supplement by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
February 23, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/3/2019 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daymon Jeffrey Rambin terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/7/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER #55 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/18. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc. (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc. (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fractus, S.A. (Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #52 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/15/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #51 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2018., Jury Selection set for 2/4/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 9/11/2018., Markman Hearing set for 8/14/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 12/17/2018., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/15/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Enter Discovery Order by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 51 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator William Cornelius, One American Center, 909 ESE Loop 323, Suite 400, Tyler, Texas 75701, telephone number 903-509-5004 and fax number 903-509- 5091, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/4/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney D. Jeffrey Rambin by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2017. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Lee Uhrich on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Uhrich, Craig) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guillermo Alarcon on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Alarcon, Guillermo) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 15, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fractus, S.A. re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J Catalano on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6551701. (Catalano, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Dismiss DefendantZTE Corporation without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ZTE Corp. by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE by Fractus, S.A. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 AGNC Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2017 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2017. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 39 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Larson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice as to ZTE (TX), Inc. denying as moot #24 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (TX) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/24/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Dykema, Erik) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (TX), Inc. by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Shoffstall on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6515216. (Shoffstall, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting as modified #32 Reply due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on October 18, 2017. (jml) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Micah John Howe terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/16/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 Response to Motion, by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dykema, Erik) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff Fractus' Response to Defendant ZTE (TX)'s Motionto Dismiss shall be due October 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2017. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Larson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
October 9, 2017 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (TX) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Micah J. Howe by Fractus, S.A.. (Larson, Blaine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 27 Summons Returned as to ZTE Corporation. (certified mail return receipt not received-left with unknown individual.) (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Harris, Alden) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE (TX), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZTE Corporation for ZTE (TX), Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (TX) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim by ZTE (TX), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavit of Chao George Shan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Upshaw, Everett) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZTE Corporation for ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss ZTE (USA) Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Venue by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affidavit of James Ray Wood, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Upshaw, Everett) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blaine Andrew Larson on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Larson, Blaine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (TX), Inc. to 9/25/2017; ZTE (USA) Inc. to 9/25/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 20 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (USA), Inc. and ZTE (TX), Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed ZTE (TX), Inc. served on 8/4/2017, answer due 8/25/2017. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed ZTE (USA) Inc. served on 8/4/2017, answer due 8/25/2017. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed ZTE Corporation served on 8/9/2017, answer due 8/30/2017. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fractus, S.A. (Howe, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Tribble, Max) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fractus, S.A.. (Howe, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 12 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Howe, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Genevieve Joanne Vose on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Vose, Genevieve) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Nelson, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie V Payne on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Payne, Leslie) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Heim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Micah John Howe on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Howe, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Rambin, Daymon) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Fractus, S.A. (Capshaw, Sidney) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6404075.), filed by Fractus, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tribble, Max) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fractus, S.A. v. ZTE Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ZTE (TX) Inc
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: Andrea Shoffstall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ZTE (USA) Inc
Represented By: Gang Chen
Represented By: David P Lindner
Represented By: Erik J Dykema
Represented By: Craig L Uhrich
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: Jeffrey John Catalano
Represented By: James R Sobieraj
Represented By: Andrea Shoffstall
Represented By: James Robert Sobieraj
Represented By: Keana Theresa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ZTE Corporation
Represented By: Andrea Shoffstall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: Scott Edward Woloson
Represented By: Daniel Allen Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fractus SA
Represented By: Guillermo Alarcon
Represented By: Genevieve Vose Wallace
Represented By: Alden Harris
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: D Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Leslie V Payne
Represented By: Max L Tribble, J
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Justin Adatto Nelson
Represented By: Blaine Andrew Larson
Represented By: Michael F Heim
Represented By: Micah John Howe
Represented By: Claire Henry
Represented By: Ophelia F Camina
Represented By: Max L Tribble, Jr
Represented By: Guillermo Alberto Alarcon
Represented By: Blaine Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?