Cupcakes of Orlando Inc et al v. GiGi's Cupcakes LLC et al

Plaintiff: L&J Cupcakes, LLC, Cupcakes of Orlando, Inc., Herbert Lee St. John, Jr., Judy Kenney, Cupcakes of Orlando Inc and L&J Cupcakes LLC
Defendant: Sovrano LLC, Gigi's Operating LLC, Food Business Services LLC, Gina Butler, Gigi's Holdings LLC, Gigi's Franchising LLC, GiGi's Cupcakes LLC, KeyCorp LLC, Alan Thompson and FundCorp Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02846
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:18-cv-2846-B consolidated with lead case 3:17-cv-3009-B. Member case administratively closed following consolidation. Further docketing should be in lead case 3:17-cv-3009-B. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/16/2018) (axm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Response and Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cupcakes of Orlando Inc, Judy Kenney, L&J Cupcakes LLC, Herbert Lee St. John, Jr re #8 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Citizenship of Parties, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Gigi's Brief, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Affidavit of Non-Service, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Delaware Sec. of State Cert., #5 Exhibit(s) E - Status of Gigi's Holdings) (Cohen, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 11/13/2018 (ajb).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/1/2018) (epm)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/29/2018) (ndt) Modified date on 10/31/2018 (epm).
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jeffrey Cohen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9544915) filed by Cupcakes of Orlando Inc, Judy Kenney, L&J Cupcakes LLC, Herbert Lee St. John, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Davis, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Anthony Garcia (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9544899) filed by Cupcakes of Orlando Inc, Judy Kenney, L&J Cupcakes LLC, Herbert Lee St. John, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Davis, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gina Butler, Food Business Services LLC, FundCorp Inc, GiGi's Cupcakes LLC, Gigi's Franchising LLC, Gigi's Holdings LLC, Gigi's Operating LLC, KeyCorp LLC, Sovrano LLC, Alan Thompson. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cupcakes of Orlando, Inc., Judy Kenney, L&J Cupcakes, LLC, Herbert Lee St. John, Jr. (Davis, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by L&J Cupcakes, LLC, Judy Kenney, Cupcakes of Orlando, Inc., Herbert Lee St. John, Jr. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9540173) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet) (Davis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cupcakes of Orlando Inc et al v. GiGi's Cupcakes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovrano LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Business Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigi's Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GiGi's Cupcakes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyCorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FundCorp Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&J Cupcakes, LLC
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cupcakes of Orlando, Inc.
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Lee St. John, Jr.
Represented By: James E Davis
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Kenney
Represented By: James E Davis
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cupcakes of Orlando Inc
Represented By: James E Davis
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&J Cupcakes LLC
Represented By: James E Davis
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?