Joe Hand Promotions Inc v Procel et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Elcia M. Procel, Francisco R. Procel, Elcia M Procel and Francisco R Procel
Case Number: 3:2018cv02857
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 the parties' Joint Motion for Telephone Rule 26(f) Conference. The Court hereby waives the face to face requirement and allows the parties to conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference telephonically. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/18/2018) (chmb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION Joint Motion for Telephone Rule 26(f) Conference re #10 Status Report Order, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re: #11 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (King, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for David Michael Walsh IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By Monday, 12/17/2018, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why local counsel has not yet appeared on its behalf. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/10/2018) (axm)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS REPORT ORDER:Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) must meet face-to-face at a mutually agreeable location, and no later than seven (7) calendar days before the Joint Status Report due date Status Report due by 12/27/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/6/2018) (ykp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elcia M Procel, Francisco R Procel. (Vanderwoude, J)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Elcia M Procel, Francisco R Procel. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney J Brian Vanderwoude added to party Elcia M Procel(pty:dft), Attorney J Brian Vanderwoude added to party Francisco R Procel(pty:dft) (Vanderwoude, J)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Amended as to Elcia Guerra Procel). Served on 11/14/2018. (King, Jamie) Modified on 11/20/2018 (dsr).
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elcia M Procel; served on 11/14/2018. (King, Jamie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Francisco R Procel; served on 11/14/2018. (King, Jamie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elcia M Procel, Francisco R Procel. (ajb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9543459) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v Procel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elcia M. Procel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco R. Procel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elcia M Procel
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco R Procel
Represented By: J Brian Vanderwoude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?