Holloway v. Dal-Tile Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ty W Holloway
Defendant: Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services Inc and Mohawk Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02922
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hash, Paul)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the deadline for Dal-Tile Corporation and Dal-Tile Services, Inc. to answer Plaintiff's Complaint is 12/4/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/28/2018) (chmb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Paul Ellis Hash added to party Dal-Tile Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Ellis Hash added to party Dal-Tile Services Inc(pty:dft) (Hash, Paul)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dal-Tile Services Inc ; served on 11/6/2018. (ndt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dal-Tile Corporation ; served on 11/6/2018. (ndt)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dal-Tile Corporation, Dal-Tile Services Inc, Mohawk Industries Inc. (mcrd/ala)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ty Holloway. (Gillespie, Joseph)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ty Holloway. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9558130) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gillespie, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Dal-Tile Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dal-Tile Corporation
Represented By: Paul Ellis Hash
Represented By: Wendy Marie Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dal-Tile Services Inc
Represented By: Paul Ellis Hash
Represented By: Wendy Marie Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty W Holloway
Represented By: James Dennis Sanford
Represented By: Joseph H Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?