Gillihan v West Coast Highway LLC

Plaintiff: Anthony Gillihan
Defendant: West Coast Highway LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv03008
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2018 8 NOTICE of Certificates of Good Standing for Motion to Appear PHV re: #6 Answer to Complaint,, #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9651707) filed by West Coast Highway LLC (Herzog, Harry)
December 17, 2018 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (See #6 Attachment #1 for document) by West Coast Highway LLC.
December 17, 2018 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9651707) filed by West Coast Highway LLC (Herzog, Harry)
December 17, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by West Coast Highway LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s))Attorney Harry A Herzog added to party West Coast Highway LLC(pty:dft) (Herzog, Harry). (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 12/18/2018) (ajb).
November 19, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to West Coast Highway LLC; served on 11/14/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas) .
November 9, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to West Coast Highway LLC. (ajb)
November 9, 2018 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
November 9, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthony Gillihan. (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against West Coast Highway, LLC filed by Anthony Gillihan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9575160) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillihan v West Coast Highway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gillihan
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas S Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Highway LLC
Represented By: Harry Arthur Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?