BMO Harris Bank NA v. Vanover
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A. and BMO Harris Bank NA
Defendant: Donald Vanover
Case Number: 3:2018cv03028
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Donald Vanover. (aaa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default against Defendant, Donald Vanover filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service of Summons - Donald Vanover, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Affidavit as to Military Service, #4 Exhibit(s) 1 - SCRA Report for Donald Vanover, #5 Proposed Order on Entry of Default) (Brakefield, Alex)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donald Vanover ; served on 11/21/2018. (Brakefield, Alex)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald Vanover. (zkc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Brakefield, Alex)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Vanover filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9581136) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Loan and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Loan and Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Loan and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit(s) D - Continuing Guaranty, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Transfer Acknowledgment) (Brakefield, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank NA v. Vanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Vanover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Alex E Brakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Alex E Brakefield
Represented By: Leslie C Basque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?