Roberts v. Randalls Food & Drugs LP

Plaintiff: Vicki P Roberts
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc and Randalls Food & Drugs LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv03176
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cameron Earl Dean on behalf of Vicki P Roberts. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dean, Cameron)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court, having considered Defendant Randall's Food & Drugs LP d/b/a Tom Thumb #l784's Response to the Court's December 19, 2018 Order to Show Cause, filed January 4, 2019, finds that Defendant has adequately addressed the Court's concern and established the existence of federal subject-matter jurisdiction in the above-styled and -numbered civil action. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/8/2019) (ykp)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP re: #10 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exh A) (Wise, Robyn)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order: Defendant CF Albert Propco, LLC is a limited liability company and that no information had been provided regarding the members of that LLC, making it impossible to determine whether federal subject-matter jurisdiction exists. The Court therefore ordered Defendants to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant show cause, no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/4/2019, as it relates to CF Albert Propco, LLC's status as a "nominal party." Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/19/2018) (ndt) Modified to add text on 12/20/2018 (zkc).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP re: #8 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Wise, Robyn)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due on or before 9:00 a.m. on 12/18/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/4/2018) (rekc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of PepsiCo Inc.'s Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by PepsiCo Inc. (Arias, Fernando)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robyn M Wise on behalf of Randalls Food & Drugs LP . (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wise, Robyn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of List of Involved Attorneys filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP (Sharp, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing of Index of Pleadings filed in the State Court filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Sharp, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP (Sharp, Michael) Modified docket text on 11/30/2018 (mcrd/ala).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 162nd Dallas County, case number DC 18 15745 filed by Randalls Food & Drugs LP . (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9616996) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sharp, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Randalls Food & Drugs LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo Inc
Represented By: Mark Douglas Hardy, Jr
Represented By: Fernando P Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randalls Food & Drugs LP
Represented By: Robyn M Wise
Represented By: Michael P Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki P Roberts
Represented By: Brittany Lee O'Brien
Represented By: Cameron Earl Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?