Roor International BV et al v. E-Z-Way Wholesale LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream Inc and Roor International BV
Defendant: E-Z-Way Wholesale LLC, Muhammad Abbas Khan and Raja Khan
Case Number: 3:2018cv03267
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion to waive or delay. The Local Counsel Requirement is waived until one week after the defendant has filed a notice of appearance or response to plaintiffs' complaint. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/4/2019) (ewd)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Waive or Delay Local Counsel Requirement re 3 Order, MOTION to Extend Time filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jacoby, Andrew)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/26/2018) (chmb) Modified to add document number on 12/26/2018 (rekc).
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Jacoby, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to E-Z-Way Wholesale LLC, Muhammad Abbas Khan, Raja Khan. (mla)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiffs RooR International BV, and Stream, Inc., shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/13/2018) (chmb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sream Inc, Roor International BV. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9642080) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Jacoby, Andrew) Modified filing fee and receipt information on 12/13/2018 (mla).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Jacoby, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. E-Z-Way Wholesale LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Z-Way Wholesale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Abbas Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?