Chowdhury v. Harvell

Plaintiff: Shamim Chowdhury
Defendant: John Harvell
Case Number: 3:2018cv03287
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by John Harvell re #19 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgmnet #13 (Turano, Joseph)
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by John Harvell re: #13 First MOTION for Summary Judgment FRCP 56 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Turano, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY filed by John Harvell re: #4 MOTION to DismissMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Turano, Joseph)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shamim Chowdhury. (Chowdhury, Shamim)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case FRCP 4 (D) Waiver of Summons- Executed 2 copies by Plaintiff filed by Shamim Chowdhury (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Chowdhury, Shamim)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: plaintiff's #12 Third Amended Original Petition. The plaintiff has not obtained either, and his third amended complaint is subject to being stricken. The defendant may (but is not required to) answer, respond or otherwise plead in response to the third amended complaint by 2/5/2019. If the defendant files a motion in the response to the third amended complaint, as permitted by this order, the plaintiff may file a response to the motion 2/26/2019. The defendant may file a reply to any response filed by the plaintiff by 3/12/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/15/2019) (mcrd)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Shamim Chowdhury re #13 First MOTION for Summary Judgment FRCP 56 (a) (Chowdhury, Shamim)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Summary Judgment FRCP 56 filed by Shamim Chowdhury with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Chowdhury, Shamim)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND UNDER RULE 15(a)1(B) against John Harvell filed by Shamim Chowdhury. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chowdhury, Shamim) Modified text as to party the case is filed against on 1/16/2019 (awc).
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND UNDER RULE 15 (a)(1)(B) against John Harvell filed by Shamim Chowdhury. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chowdhury, Shamim)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: the plaintiff's #8 Motion to Extend Time for Filing Response and Brief; and #9 Amended Motion to Extend Time for Filing Response and Brief. The motions are granted, and the plaintiff's deadline to file his response is extended until 1/14/2019. The defendant's deadline to file its reply is likewise extended by 3 days, until 1/28/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/14/2019) (mcrd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Shamim Chowdhury (Chowdhury, Shamim) Modified text and linkage on 1/14/2019 (mla).
January 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Shamim Chowdhury (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chowdhury, Shamim)
December 26, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Dec 26 08:57:19 CST 2018 (crt)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #4 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/24/2018) (axm) Modified judge on 12/27/2018 (axm).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by John Harvell re #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 4) (Turano, Joseph)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by John Harvell re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Turano, Joseph)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Harvell (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Turano, Joseph) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (axm).
December 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Fri Dec 14 11:12:28 CST 2018 (crt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 116th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-16335 filed by John Harvell. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9646493) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Index of Matters, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4 - State Court Documents, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Interested Parties, #6 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Turano, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chowdhury v. Harvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harvell
Represented By: Joseph A Turano
Represented By: Charles Adam Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamim Chowdhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?