Smith v. Hilton Hotels Corporation

Plaintiff: Toni Mooney Smith
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv03338
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Anjali Sharma and Shannon Holmes; Defense - Fernando Arias. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :18. (chmb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Hilton Hotels Corporation. (Hardy, Mark)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9738800) filed by Toni Mooney Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Anjali Sharma added to party Toni Mooney Smith(pty:pla) (Sharma, Anjali)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/16/2019) (epm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilton Hotels Corporation. (Arias, Fernando)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Hilton Hotels Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9658284) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Documents) (Arias, Fernando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hilton Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Mark Douglas Hardy, Jr
Represented By: Fernando P Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Mooney Smith
Represented By: Rahfaan Clive Markland
Represented By: Anjali Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?