Reed v. Quicken Loans Inc
Plaintiff: Jeremy Reed
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv03377
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford for hearing if necessary and Findings and Recommendations. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/12/2019) (chmb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Quicken Loans Inc re #10 Response/Objection (Robinson, Bradford)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Kyle Tayman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/28/2019) (chmb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William Kyle Tayman (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9730387) filed by Quicken Loans Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Bradford)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Jeremy Reed re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Ward, Lloyd)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Quicken Loans Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Robinson, Bradford)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Quicken Loans Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Bradford)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford John Robinson on behalf of Quicken Loans Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Robinson, Bradford)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, Defendant, Quicken Loans, Inc., shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result defendant's pleadings being stricken and default taken against that defendant without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/21/2018) (chmb)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise Respond. Quicken Loans Inc answer or response due 1/9/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/21/2018) (chmb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Quicken Loans Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Davis, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 116th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, case number DC-18-17794 filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9664257) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (State Court Docket), #2 Exhibit(s) B (Index of State Court Documents), #3 Exhibit(s) B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B-2, #5 Exhibit(s) B-3, #6 Exhibit(s) B-4, #7 Exhibit(s) B-5, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement, #10 Corporate Disclosure and Certificate of Interested Parties) (Davis, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Quicken Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Represented By: Mark G Davis
Represented By: Bradford John Robinson
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Reed
Represented By: Lloyd Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?