Cid v. Wal-Mart Stores East LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonia Cid
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Mar 4 16:32:42 CST 2019 (crt)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Motions due by 3/2/2020. The above case is set for trial at 9:00 a.m. on 7/6/2020 in the United States District Courtroom, Earle Cabell Federal Building, Dallas, Texas, before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings, (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/4/2019) (ykp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (Davis, Derek)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores East LLC and Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Davis, Derek)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No. 3, Dallas County, TX, case number CC-18-05916-C filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LLC and Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9682979) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Davis, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cid v. Wal-Mart Stores East LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Represented By: S Hunter Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LLC
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Represented By: S Hunter Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Cid
Represented By: Craig Weldon Thomas
Represented By: David Lira Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?