Brown v. Cooley et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Brown
Defendant: Agusta McGriff and Clay Cooley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: Sam A Lindsay
1 Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6. Mon Feb 4 17:28:01 CST 2019 (crt)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's state law claim should be dismissed without prejudice and his remaining claims should be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/4/2019) (zkc)
January 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Jan 17 12:25:13 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/17/2019) (epm)
January 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Jan 8 11:14:28 CST 2019 (crt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Brown. (aaa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Clay Cooley, Agusta McGriff filed by Bobby Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agusta McGriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?